Al-Khawalani v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Petitioner: Ahmed Al-Khawalani
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv00182
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Janet T Neff
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by respondent U.S. Department of Homeland Security re Brief in Support of a Motion #9 , MOTION to dismiss for Mootness #8 , PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion to Dismiss for Mootness by respondent U.S. Department of Homeland Security #10 (Long, Jeanne)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion to Dismiss for Mootness by respondent U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Long, Jeanne)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for Mootness #8 filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wandyg Declaration) (Long, Jeanne)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss for Mootness by respondent U.S. Department of Homeland Security; (Long, Jeanne)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Order to Answer (Habeas - Section 2241), #6 , Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) #5 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Ahmed Al-Khawalani returned to the Court marked Inmate Transferred, Refused; Unable to Forward (mlc)
September 24, 2019 Copy of Order to Answer (Habeas - Section 2241), #6 , Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Ahmed Al-Khawalani (mlc)
September 24, 2019 Copy of Order to Answer (Habeas - Section 2241), #6 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 sent via U.S. Mail to Sheriff Mike Bitnar and the U.S. Attorney Ryan Cobb (mlc)
September 24, 2019 SERVICE by CERTIFIED MAIL pursuant to court order completed: copy of Petition with Order to Serve #6 sent by certified mail, article number 7015 1520 0002 0362 5465 to Office of the Director ICE (mlc)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING: the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and memorandum in support on the respondent by certified mail; respondent to answer the habeas petition within 21 days ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 SIGNATURE PAGE submitted by petitioner Ahmed Al-Khawalani for MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 (mlc)
September 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeanne Frances Long on behalf of respondent U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Long, Jeanne)
September 16, 2019 Copy of Conditional Order Striking Pleading or Other Paper #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Ahmed Al-Khawalani (mlc)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONDITIONAL ORDER striking MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 unless the filing party submits a signature page within 21 days ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 (SEE #4 FOR SIGNATURE) (UNSIGNED) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by petitioner Ahmed Al-Khawalani; (mlc) Modified text on 9/16/2019 (cam). Modified text on 9/23/2019 (mlc).
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Ahmed Al-Khawalani (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments) (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Khawalani v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jeanne Frances Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ahmed Al-Khawalani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?