Larson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Terry Leonard Larson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00212
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to attorney William T. Nordeen regarding recent filing #6 , #5 , #7 (mlc)
November 11, 2019 SUMMONS returned executed on Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Commissioner of Social Security complete on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019 (mlc) Modified text on 11/12/2019; as taken from #5 , #6 , #7 (mlc).
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Terry Leonard Larson re Summons Issued as to USA #4 , complaint #1 Social Security Commission (Nordeen, William)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Terry Leonard Larson re Summons Issued as to USA #4 , complaint #1 US Attorney (Nordeen, William)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Terry Leonard Larson re Summons Issued as to USA #4 , complaint #1 Attorney General (Nordeen, William)
November 4, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Pamela Ann Kultgen on behalf of defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Kultgen, Pamela)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mlc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (mlc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Nordeen, William)
October 23, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Terry Leonard Larson in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4572960 (Nordeen, William)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Terry Leonard Larson (Nordeen, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Leonard Larson
Represented By: William T. Nordeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Pamela Ann Kultgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?