McGore #142739 v. Michigan State Police et al
Plaintiff: Darryl McGore #142739
Defendant: Michigan State Police and Joseph O'Leary
Case Number: 2:2019cv00228
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF in support of MOTION for temporary restraining order #12 (pages 3-4 were not included with this filing) filed by Darryl McGore #142739 (slk)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Darryl McGore #142739; (slk)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to amend/correct #1 by plaintiff Darryl McGore #142739; (slk)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Darryl McGore #142739 re MOTION to remand #7 , Notice of Interlocutory Appeal #9 , MOTION to amend/correct #1 #8 (mlc)
January 7, 2020 Copy of Notice of Interlocutory Appeal #9 with docket sheet sent via U.S. Mail to Darryl McGore (mlc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL re #2 , #3 by plaintiff Darryl McGore #142739 (mlc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to amend/correct #1 by plaintiff Darryl McGore #142739; (mlc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to remand by plaintiff Darryl McGore #142739; (mlc)
December 17, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion to Amend/Correct #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Darryl McGore (mlc)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 motion to amend/correct ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Darryl McGore #142739 re MOTION to amend/correct #1 #4 (slk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to amend/correct #1 by plaintiff Darryl McGore #142739; (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter with signature, #2 appearance, #3 proposed notice of hearing) (slk)
December 5, 2019 Copy of Opinion (Screening) #2 , Order Denying IFP - Three Strikes - Prisoner #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Darryl McGore (slk)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING IFP UNDER THREE STRIKES RULE: plaintiff to pay the entire fee of $400.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Darryl McGore #142739 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (slk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGore #142739 v. Michigan State Police et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl McGore #142739
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?