Jones v. Interlake Steamship Company
Plaintiff: Krista Jones
Defendant: Interlake Steamship Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00254
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Copy of Notice of Hearing #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Ellis Boal (mlc)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of telephone status conference set for 6/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (not on 6/25/2020); (cam)
February 3, 2020 Copy of Notice of Hearing #11 , Case Management Order, #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Ellis Boal and James P. Verdi (mlc)
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of telephone status conference set for 6/25/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; The parties are to call into the Court's conference line at 866-434-5269, Access Code 6087272 (cam)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 7/31/2020; dispositive motions due by 8/31/2020; settlement and final pretrial conference set for 5/17/2021 at 09:30 AM at Marquette, MI before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; jury trial set for 6/7/2021 at 08:45 AM at Marquette, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney James P. Verdi; attorney admission deadline set for 2/28/2020; (mlc)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Ellis Boal; attorney admission deadline set for 2/28/2020; (mlc)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Proceedings Not Recorded) (cam)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Ryan, Timothy)
January 21, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark L. Dobias on behalf of plaintiff Krista Jones (Dobias, Mark)
December 27, 2019 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Krista Jones (mlc)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 1/31/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 1/28/2020 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to complaint #1 by Interlake Steamship Company with Certificate of Service thereon (Ryan, Timothy) Modified text on 12/26/2019 (mlc).
December 18, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Interlake Steamship Company in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4711739 (Ryan, Timothy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Interlake Steamship Company identifying Corporate Parent Interlake Holding Company for Interlake Steamship Company (Ryan, Timothy)
December 18, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Krista Jones (mlc)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (mlc)
December 17, 2019 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to the Circuit Court of Michigan for Chippewa County as taken from #1 by defendant Interlake Steamship Company (mlc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chippewa County 50th Circuit Court case number 19-15841 filed by Interlake Steamship Company (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Summons and Complaint) (Ryan, Timothy) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (mlc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Interlake Steamship Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Jones
Represented By: Mark L. Dobias
Represented By: Ellis Boal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interlake Steamship Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Ryan
Represented By: Vincent Tersigni
Represented By: James P. Verdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?