Jones v. Interlake Steamship Company et al
Plaintiff: Krista Jones
Defendant: and Marine Engineers Beneficial Association District # 1-PC, Interlake Steamship Company and Marine Engineers' Beneficial Association, District #1-PCD
Case Number: 2:2019cv00255
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Copy of Notice of Hearing #27 sent via U.S. Mail to Ellis Boal and James R. Rosenberg (mlc)
February 7, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of telephone status conference set for 6/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; (and not on 6/25/2020) (cam)
February 7, 2020 Copy of Notice Rescheduling Hearing #26 sent via U.S. Mail to Ellis Boal, James P. Verdi, James R. Rosenberg (mlc)
February 3, 2020 Copy of Case Management Order, #23 , Notice of Hearing #24 sent via U.S. Mail to Ellis Boal, James P. Verdi, James R. Rosenberg (mlc)
February 3, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 6/15/2020 in error; telephone status conference set for 6/25/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; (cam)
February 3, 2020 Filing 25 (DISREGARD) NOTICE of telephone status conference set for 6/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; The parties are to call into the Court's conference line at 866-434-5269, Access Code 6087272 (cam) Modified text on 2/3/2020; please see #24 for correct date (mlc).
February 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of telephone status conference set for 6/25/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; The parties are to call into the Court's conference line at 866-434-5269, Access Code 6087272 (cam)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 7/31/2020; dispositive motions due by 8/31/2020; settlement and final pretrial conference set for 5/17/2021 at 09:30 AM at Marquette, MI before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; jury trial set for 6/7/2021 at 08:45 AM at Marquette, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Sherrie Voyles' motion to withdraw as attorney; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
January 31, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney James P. Verdi; attorney admission deadline set for 2/28/2020; (mlc)
January 31, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Ellis Boal; attorney admission deadline set for 2/28/2020; (mlc)
January 31, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Proceedings Not Recorded) (cam)
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to withdraw as attorney by defendant Marine Engineers' Beneficial Association, District #1-PCD; (Voyles, Sherrie)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Ryan, Timothy)
January 27, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Paul D. Starr on behalf of defendant Marine Engineers' Beneficial Association, District #1-PCD (Starr, Paul)
January 23, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion for Limited Admission #16 sent via U.S. Mail to Paul D. Starr and James R. Rosenberg (mlc)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #9 motion for limited admission ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, rbk)
January 21, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark L. Dobias on behalf of plaintiff Krista Jones (Dobias, Mark)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER - SECOND NOTICE sent to attorney Paul D. Starr; attorney admission deadline set for 2/18/2020; (jlb)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER - SECOND NOTICE sent to attorney James R. Rosenberg; attorney admission deadline set for 2/18/2020; (jlb)
December 27, 2019 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone, #12 , Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone, #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Krista Jones, Paul D. Starr and James R. Rosenberg (mlc)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 1/31/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 1/28/2020 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 1/31/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 1/28/2020 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
December 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to complaint #1 by Interlake Steamship Company with Certificate of Service thereon (Ryan, Timothy) Modified text on 12/26/2019 (mlc).
December 24, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marine Engineers' Beneficial Association, District #1-PCD (Voyles, Sherrie)
December 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for limited admission Pro Hac Vice by defendant Marine Engineers' Beneficial Association, District #1-PCD; (Voyles, Sherrie)
December 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to complaint #1 and Affirmative Defenses by Marine Engineers' Beneficial Association, District #1-PCD with Proof of Service thereon (Voyles, Sherrie) Modified text on 12/26/2019 (mlc).
December 19, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sherrie Voyles on behalf of defendant Marine Engineers' Beneficial Association, District #1-PCD (Voyles, Sherrie)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Paul D. Starr; attorney admission deadline set for 1/16/2020; (mlc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney James R. Rosenberg; attorney admission deadline set for 1/16/2020; (mlc)
December 19, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Krista Jones, Paul D. Starr and James S. Rosenberg (mlc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mlc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 (DISREGARD) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mlc) Modified text on 12/19/2019; no NEF went out (mlc)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Judge Vermaat indicating that this case is related to case 2:19-cv-254 (mkc)
December 18, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Interlake Steamship Company in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4711787 (Ryan, Timothy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Interlake Steamship Company identifying Corporate Parent Interlake Holding Company for Interlake Steamship Company (Ryan, Timothy)
December 17, 2019 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to the Circuit Court of Michigan for Chippewa County as taken from #1 by defendant Interlake Steamship Company (mlc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chippewa County 50th Circuit Court case number 19-15842-CK filed by Interlake Steamship Company (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Consent to Remove, #2 Ex 2 - Summons and Complaint) (Ryan, Timothy) Modified text on 12/19/2019 (mlc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Interlake Steamship Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Jones
Represented By: Mark L. Dobias
Represented By: Ellis Boal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and Marine Engineers Beneficial Association District # 1-PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interlake Steamship Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Ryan
Represented By: Vincent Tersigni
Represented By: James P. Verdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Engineers' Beneficial Association, District #1-PCD
Represented By: Sherrie Voyles
Represented By: Paul D. Starr
Represented By: James R. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?