Reese #669959 v. Bolm et al
Plaintiff: Terrell Ravon Reese #669959
Defendant: Unknown Anderson, C. Negrinelli, Unknown Labelle, Unknown Watson, D. Carlson, A. Paige, Unknown Josh, Unknown Thorrington and Unknown Bolm
Case Number: 2:2020cv00004
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Janet T Neff
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #10 with rejected pleading sent via U.S. Mail to Terrell Ravon Reese (mlc)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REJECTING Declaration submitted by Terrell Ravon Reese ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Attachments: #1 Rejected Document) (cam)
February 24, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $14.57, receipt number MQ006086; amount paid to date $14.57 (slk)
February 20, 2020 Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Terrell Ravon Reese (mlc)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by March 12, 2020; w/attached Protocol ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (lep)
February 19, 2020 Copy of Order #8 , Opinion (Screening) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Terrell Ravon Reese (mlc)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION; Order to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff Terrell Ravon Reese #669959 to Macomb CF (mlc) Modified text on 2/18/2020; please note, re-sent docket sheet due to address change (mlc).
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from plaintiff Terrell Ravon Reese #669959 requesting docket sheet; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (mlc)
January 27, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Terrell Ravon Reese (mlc)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $14.57 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; initial partial filing fee to be submitted by 2/24/2020 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION re #2 by plaintiff Terrell Ravon Reese #669959 (mlc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT statement by plaintiff Terrell Ravon Reese #669959 (mlc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Terrell Ravon Reese #669959 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese #669959 v. Bolm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Negrinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Labelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Josh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Thorrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Ravon Reese #669959
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?