Richards et al v. Perttu
Plaintiff: Robert Kissee #575639, Kyle B. Richards #641715 and Kenneth Damon Pruitt #708518
Defendant: Unknown Perttu and Perttu
Case Number: 2:2020cv00076
Filed: June 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT/REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service delivered to USM as to defendant Unknown Perttu (slk)
July 17, 2020 Copy of Order Removing Case from Early Mediation #15 , Order Regarding Service - Prisoner #16 sent via U.S. Mail to all plaintiffs (slk)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER LIFTING STAY and REGARDING SERVICE: the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the defendants ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM EARLY MEDIATION re #13 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (lep)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Unknown Perttu re Attorney Appearance (Limited), Statement to Exclude Case from Early Mediation #13 (Soros, Allan)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 STATEMENT from defendant Unknown Perttu seeking exclusion from the prisoner civil rights litigation early mediation program (Soros, Allan)
July 14, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Allan J. Soros on behalf of defendant Unknown Perttu for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Soros, Allan)
June 29, 2020 Copy of Order Staying Early Mediation re COVID-19 #12 , Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #11 sent via U.S. Mail to all plaintiffs (slk)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING EARLY MEDIATION due to COVID-19 pandemic and #Administrative Order 20-MS-024 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (lep)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by July 17, 2020; w/attached Protocol ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (lep)
June 26, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner, Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #10 sent via U.S. Mail to to all plaintiffs (mlc)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: Plaintiffs Richards and Pruitt may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; Plaintiffs Richards and Pruitt to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available and TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: Plaintiff Kissee to pay an initial partial fee of $4.83 when funds are available; Plaintiff Kissee to make interim payments until the full fee is paid. Plaintiff Richards' motion to serve the complaint #8 is denied without prejudice as unnecessary ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff Kyle B. Richards #641715 (slk)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to serve the complaint by plaintiff Kyle B. Richards #641715; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (slk)
June 8, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #7 sent via U.S. Mail to all plaintiffs (slk)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of receipt of case (slk)
June 7, 2020 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-11331; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
June 4, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan on Kyle Brandon Richards, 641715, BARAGA MAXIMUM CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 13924 WADAGA ROAD, BARAGA, MI 49908 ; Kenneth Pruitt, 708518, BARAGA MAXIMUM CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 13924 WADAGA ROAD, BARAGA, MI 49908 ; and Robert Lee Kissee, 575639, BARAGA MAXIMUM CORRECTIONAL FACILITY,13924 WADAGA ROAD, BARAGA, MI 49908 (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/7/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/7/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Robert Lee Kissee. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/7/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Kenneth Pruitt. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/7/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Kyle Brandon Richards. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/7/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral (with exhibits) filed by Kyle Brandon Richards, Robert Lee Kissee, Kenneth Pruitt against Perta (Attachments: #1 Coversheet) (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/7/2020.] Modified text on 6/8/2020 (slk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards et al v. Perttu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Perttu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perttu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kissee #575639
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle B. Richards #641715
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Damon Pruitt #708518
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?