Mott-Bey #162319 v. Horton
Petitioner: Sylvester Mott-Bey #162319
Respondent: Connie Horton
Case Number: 2:2020cv00078
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 7/8/2020 or the action will be dismissed ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-11380; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/9/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sylvester Mottbey. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/9/2020.] Modified on 6/10/2020 (cam)- to unterm the motion.
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sylvester Mottbey against Heidi E Washington. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mott-Bey #162319 v. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Connie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sylvester Mott-Bey #162319
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?