Brooks #153447 v. Horton et al
Petitioner: Terry Darcel Brooks #153447
Respondent: Connie Horton and Heidi L. Washington
Case Number: 2:2020cv00093
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Copy of Deficiency Order, #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Terry Darcel Brooks (mlc)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 7/24/2020 or the action will be dismissed ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
June 26, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Terry Darcel Brooks (mlc)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-11532; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING petition for writ of habeas corpus to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Terry Brooks. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terry Brooks against Connie Horton. (DAll) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2020: #1 Coversheet) (DAll). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks #153447 v. Horton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Connie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Heidi L. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terry Darcel Brooks #153447
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?