Dixon #200732 v. Brown
Petitioner: Anthony Dixon #200732
Respondent: Mike Brown
Case Number: 2:2020cv00116
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Janet T Neff
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion to Amend/Correct #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Dixon (slk)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #11 and #13 construed as a motion to alter or amend judgment; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION to amend/correct #1 regarding exhaustion #11 by petitioner Anthony Dixon #200732 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (slk)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Anthony Dixon #200732 re MOTION to amend/correct #1 regarding exhaustion #11 (slk)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to amend/correct #1 regarding exhaustion by petitioner Anthony Dixon #200732; (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit 1) (slk)
July 31, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $5.00, receipt number MQ006131; amount paid to date $5.00 (slk)
July 30, 2020 Certified Copy of Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #9 , Opinion (Screening) #8 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Dixon (mlc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying certificate of appealability; Petitioner's request for preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED as moot; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION; Order and Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 13, 2020 Copy of Deficiency Order, #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Dixon (mlc)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 8/10/2020 or the action will be dismissed ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
July 13, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Dixon (mlc)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-11412; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
July 9, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan on Anthony Dixon 200732KINROSS CORRECTIONAL FACILITY4533 W. Industrial Park DriveKINCHELOE, MI 49786 (TMcg) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION [MOTION] to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Anthony Dixon. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony Dixon against Mike Brown. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon #200732 v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Dixon #200732
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?