Powell #261114 v. Washington et al
Petitioner: Dwayne Leo Powell #261114
Respondent: Connie Horton and Heidi L. Washington
Case Number: 2:2020cv00140
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Certified Copy of Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #8 , Opinion (Screening) #7 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Dwayne Leo Powell (slk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Petitioner's requests for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunctive relief #2 are DENIED as moot; denying certificate of appealability ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 11, 2020 Copy of Deficiency Order, #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Dwayne Leo Powell (slk)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 9/8/2020 or the action will be dismissed ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
August 10, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Dwayne Leo Powell (mlc)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 4:20-cv-12026; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Dwayne Leo Powell. (LGra) Modified on 8/7/2020 (THal). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Dwayne Leo Powell against Connie Horton, Heidi Washington. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet) (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell #261114 v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Connie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Heidi L. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dwayne Leo Powell #261114
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?