Leonardi Manufacturing Co. v. Bay Engineering, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Leonardi Manufacturing Co.
Defendant: Bay Engineering, Inc. doing business as Stumper Industries and Bay Electric, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00147
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
2 Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071 ; District Judge Paul L. Maloney is no longer assigned to the case (slk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 (DISREGARD) NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071 ; District Judge Paul L. Maloney is no longer assigned to the case (slk) Modified text on 9/30/2020 - document did not attach(slk).
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Leonardi Manufacturing Co. (Harrell, Michelle)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on the filing of a PATENT ACTION (slk)
August 18, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Bay Electric, Inc., Bay Engineering, Inc. (not provided at the time of filing) (slk)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (slk)
August 18, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Leonardi Manufacturing Co. in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5585601 (Harrell, Michelle) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (jlg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Leonardi Manufacturing Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Harrell, Michelle) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (jlg) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (slk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonardi Manufacturing Co. v. Bay Engineering, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Engineering, Inc. doing business as Stumper Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardi Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Michelle Caty Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?