Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00154
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference, using the Court's conference line, set for 10/27/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 10/23/2020 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. (Stanczyk, Matthew)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071 ; Judge Janet T. Neff is no longer assigned to the case (slk)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020 (Carroll, Philip) Modified text on 9/23/2020 (mlc).
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020 (Carroll, Philip) Modified text on 9/4/2020 (mlc).
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company (Carroll, Philip)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. (mlc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mlc)
August 21, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5602882 (Carroll, Philip)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. filed by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Carroll, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew John Stanczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip T. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?