Mease #213302 v. Washington et. al.
Plaintiff: John Eugene Mease #213302 and Shakur Muhammad
Defendant: Unknown Dye, Unknown Yon, R. Batho, Unknown Lemmerman, Unknown Wech, Shane Thompson, Unknown Slater, Ricky J. Wonnacott, Connie Horton, Heidi Washington, Unknown Bridges, Unknown Simpson, James Corrigan, C. McKinney and Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2020cv00176
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Janet T Neff
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for reconsideration re #8 , #7 (named as "motion for relief from order") by plaintiff John Eugene Mease #213302; (slk)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING IFP UNDER THREE STRIKES RULE: August 10, 2020 order #3 is VACATED; plaintiff to pay the entire fee of $400.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Denying IFP - Three Strikes - Prisoner #8 , Opinion (Screening) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to John Eugene Mease (slk)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of receipt of case (slk)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-12087; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to John Eugene Mease (slk)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER partially dismissing complaint and transferring case to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/17/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan mailed to John Eugene Mease 213302 at CENTRAL MICHIGAN CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 320 N. HUBBARD, ST. LOUIS, MI 48880. (BSau) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/17/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (TTho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/17/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs John Eugene Mease, 213302, CENTRAL MICHIGAN CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 320 N. HUBBARD, ST. LOUIS, MI 48880 (TTho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/17/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by John Eugene Mease. (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/17/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Eugene Mease against Heidi Washington (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet) (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mease #213302 v. Washington et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eugene Mease #213302
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shakur Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Yon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Batho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lemmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky J. Wonnacott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?