Coxon v. GS Engineering, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Coxon
Defendant: Glen Simula, GS Engineering, Inc., GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust, Lynn Eliason and GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan
Case Number: 2:2021cv00065
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 36 STIPULATION REGARDING ANSWER DEADLINE by defendants Lynn Eliason, GS Engineering, Inc., GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust (Lane, Madelaine)
May 28, 2021 Filing 35 REPLY to response to motion #3 filed by Christopher Coxon (mlc) Modified text on 5/28/2021; filed per Order #34 (mlc).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 motion for leave to file to file a reply brief that exceeds the word limit; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
May 24, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to file excess pages re: #3 , Plaintiff's Reply Brief Supporting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Appointment of Receiver by plaintiff Christopher Coxon; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Proposed Plaintiff's Reply Brief Supporting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Appointment of Receiver, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10) (Courtade, Bruce) Modified on 5/25/2021 - to relate to motion (cam).
May 24, 2021 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition #31 filed by Glen Simula (Krueger, Robb)
May 24, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION to appoint receiver #3 filed by Glen Simula (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Krueger, Robb) Modified text on 5/25/2021 (mlc).
May 17, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition, #29 filed by Lynn Eliason, GS Engineering, Inc., GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust (Lane, Madelaine)
May 17, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION to appoint receiver #3 filed by Lynn Eliason, GS Engineering, Inc., GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Eliason Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Bylaws) (Lane, Madelaine)
May 11, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robb Stuart Krueger on behalf of defendant Glen Simula (Krueger, Robb)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 26, 2021 Filing 27 MINUTES of telephone conference held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Proceedings not recorded) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 23, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE cancelling hearing: 4/27/2021 evidentiary hearing is cancelled; telephone conference scheduled for 4/26/2021 at 10:00 a.m.; counsel for plaintiff is responsible for coordination of the call (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 22, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses by Glen Simula (Attachments: #1 Affirmative Defenses) (Eliason, Matthew) Modified text on 4/23/2021 (slk).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Motion for preliminary injunction #3 is granted; See notice of the hearing for preliminary injunction; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
April 22, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of evidentiary hearing set for 4/27/2021 at 10:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 22, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTES of telephone conference held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Proceedings not recorded) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 21, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of telephone conference set for 4/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; counsel for plaintiff is responsible for the coordination of the call (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying STIPULATION #18 to place documents under restricted access; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending temporary restraining order until 4/23/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 9, 2021 Filing 18 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Place Documents Under Restricted Access by plaintiff Christopher Coxon (Courtade, Bruce)
April 9, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order with Proposed Order by defendants Lynn Eliason, GS Engineering, Inc., GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust (Bratt, Paul) Modified text on 4/12/2021 (mlc).
April 8, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTES of telephone conference held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Proceedings not recorded) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of telephone conference set for 4/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for the coordination of the call (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 7, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed; Glen Simula served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021 (Courtade, Bruce)
April 7, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Christopher Coxon re Brief in Support of a Motion, #4 , MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION to appoint receiver #3 , Order on Motion for TRO, #8 , complaint,, #1 (Courtade, Bruce)
April 7, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition, #11 filed by Lynn Eliason, GS Engineering, Inc., GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust (Lane, Madelaine)
April 7, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION to appoint receiver #3 filed by Lynn Eliason, GS Engineering, Inc., GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Eliason Affidavit) (Lane, Madelaine)
April 6, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott R. Carvo on behalf of defendants Lynn Eliason, GS Engineering, Inc., GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust (Carvo, Scott)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding STIPULATION Request to Seal #9 : motion hearing is set for 4/9/2021 at 02:00 PM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 5, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Madelaine C. Lane on behalf of defendants Lynn Eliason, GS Engineering, Inc., GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust (Lane, Madelaine)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Request to Seal by defendants Lynn Eliason, GS Engineering, Inc., GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust (Bratt, Paul)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 motion for TRO; Defendants may file a response to the request for injunctive relief no later than noon(12:00 p.m.) on 4/7/2021; A hearing for a preliminary injunction will be held on 4/9/2021 at 2:00 p.m. at the Federal Courthouse in Kalamazoo, Michigan,located at 410 W. Michigan Avenue; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Lynn Eliason, GS Engineering, Inc., GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust, Glen Simula (mlc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mlc)
April 2, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Paul Donald Bratt on behalf of defendants Lynn Eliason, GS Engineering, Inc., GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust (Bratt, Paul)
April 2, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Hal G. Ostrow on behalf of plaintiff Christopher Coxon (Ostrow, Hal)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, #4 filed by Christopher Coxon (Courtade, Bruce)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 BRIEF in support of MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION to appoint receiver #3 filed by Christopher Coxon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 21, #8 Exhibit 26) (Courtade, Bruce)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for temporary restraining order , MOTION for preliminary injunction , MOTION to appoint receiver by plaintiff Christopher Coxon; (Courtade, Bruce)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Courtade, Bruce)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and request for injunctive and declaratory relief against All Defendants filed by Christopher Coxon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27) (Courtade, Bruce) Modified text on 4/2/2021 (mlc).
April 1, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Christopher Coxon in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6398834 (Courtade, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coxon v. GS Engineering, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Simula
Represented By: Robb Stuart Krueger
Represented By: Matthew C. Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Scott R. Carvo
Represented By: Madelaine C. Lane
Represented By: Paul Donald Bratt
Represented By: Amanda May Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Trust
Represented By: Scott R. Carvo
Represented By: Madelaine C. Lane
Represented By: Paul Donald Bratt
Represented By: Amanda May Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Eliason
Represented By: Scott R. Carvo
Represented By: Madelaine C. Lane
Represented By: Paul Donald Bratt
Represented By: Amanda May Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Engineering, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan
Represented By: Scott R. Carvo
Represented By: Madelaine C. Lane
Represented By: Paul Donald Bratt
Represented By: Amanda May Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Coxon
Represented By: Bruce Anthony Courtade
Represented By: Hal G. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?