Wood #709359 v. Brown
Petitioner: Samuel Wood #709359
Respondent: Mike Brown
Case Number: 2:2021cv00121
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OBJECTION by petitioner Samuel Wood #709359 to Report and Recommendation #22 (mlc)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to SEAL report and recommendation #22 named as, "motion for procedures governing the electronic availability and redaction of transcripts and to restrict or seal #22 of the proceedings and all orders and rulings from public access" by petitioner Samuel Wood #709359; (mlc)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Report and Recommendation #22 sent via U.S. Mail to Samuel Wood (slk)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 - recommending that the petition be denied; objections to R&R due within 14 days ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-12576; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ems)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #21 sent via U.S. Mail to Samuel Wood (mlc)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION AND ORDER granting motion to consolidate, granting #5 Motion for update to confinement, granting #14 Motion to supplement petition, denying #7 Motion for appointment of counsel, denying in part petition for writ of habeas corpus brough pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, and tranferring the petition for writ of habeas corpus to the United States District Court for the Western District of Michigan and granting leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #18 Order Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan and #19 Judgment mailed to Samuel Wood #709359, KINROSS CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 4533 W. Industrial Park Drive, KINCHELOE, MI 49788. (LHos) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER from Samuel Wood (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samuel Wood (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EXHIBITS by Samuel Wood (document titled as motion number 12) (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to supplement #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus by Samuel Wood. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to dismiss filed by Samuel Wood. (document titled as a motion) (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER of appearance by Samuel Wood (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Rule 5 Materials by Mike Brown. (Attachments: #1 01.Genesee Co Register Of Actions, #2 02.04-14-2008 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #3 03.10-22-2008 Pretrial Conference and Plea Agreement Hearing Transcript, #4 04.07-31-2009 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #5 05.03-08-2010 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #6 06.08-16-2010 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #7 07.11-09-2010 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #8 08.03-11-2011 Motion Hearing Transcript, #9 09.04-18-2011 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #10 10.05-13-2011 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #11 11.05-31-2011 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #12 12.07-22-2011 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #13 13.09-07-2011 Hearing Transcript, #14 14.11-02-2012 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #15 15.11-07-2012 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #16 16.11-16-2012 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #17 17.11-21-2012 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #18 18.11-30-2012 Pretrial Hearing Transcript, #19 19.01-09-2013 Motion for Reconsideration and Reinstatement of Plea Transcript, #20 20.05-09-2013 Motion Hearing Transcript, #21 21.05-10-2013 Motion Hearing Transcript, #22 22.05-17-2013 Ruling Hearing Transcript, #23 23.06-04-2013 Sentencing Hearing Transcript, #24 24.06-05-2013 Plea Hearing Transcript, #25 25.07-08-2013 Sentencing Hearing Transcript, #26 26.Michigan Court of Appeals 323874, #27 27.Michigan Supreme Court 150973) (Banghart-Linn, Linus) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under Habeas Rule 4, Brief in Support, with Certificate of Service by Mike Brown. (Banghart-Linn, Linus) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Linus R. Banghart-Linn on behalf of Mike Brown. (Banghart-Linn, Linus) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Christensen-Brown on behalf of Mike Brown. (Christensen-Brown, Andrea) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for appointment of counsel by Samuel Wood. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Samuel Wood. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for update to confinement by Samuel Wood. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Michigan Attorney General and the Michigan Department of Corrections. Response due by 3/23/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (Attachments: #1 Habeas Petition) (TTho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading, on Samuel Wood, 709359, KINROSS CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 4533 W. Industrial Park Drive, KINCHELOE, MI 49786 (TTho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order FILING FEE Received in the amount of 5.00 by Samuel Wood - Receipt No. DET132351 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (RBog) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee. Correction due by 10/23/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (TTho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Order to Correct Deficiency (Habeas and 1983 Complaints Only) on Samuel Wood, 709359, KINROSS CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 4533 W. Industrial Park Drive, KINCHELOE, MI 49786 (TTho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Samuel Wood against Mike Brown. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DAll) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2020: #2 COVERSHEET) (DAll). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood #709359 v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Wood #709359
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Brown
Represented By: Andrea M. Christensen-Brown
Represented By: Linus Richard Banghart-Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?