Thompkins #575337 v. Binner et al
Plaintiff: Demetric Thompkins #575337
Defendant: Erica Huss, Unknown Binner, Unknown Vinder, Unknown Miller, Unknown Whitlar, Unknown Lamentola, Unknown Bemister and Unknown Jarvis
Case Number: 2:2021cv00138
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #16 motion to appoint counsel ; denying #17 motion for extension of time to file amended complaint; the Clerk shall REJECT any further motions signed by all of the original plaintiffs in this case for filing in all of the severed, related cases; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #19 sent via U.S. Mail to Demetric Thompkins (slk)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed per Order #15 ) against Unknown Bemister, Unknown Binner, Erica Huss, Unknown Lamentola, Unknown Miller, Unknown Whitlar, Unknown Jarvis filed by Demetric Thompkins #575337 (mlc)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for extension of time to file amended complaint by plaintiff Demetric Thompkins #575337; (slk)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Demetric Thompkins #575337; (slk)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form #15 sent via U.S. Mail to all plaintiffs with their respective docket sheet and amended 1983 complaint form (ems)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing the filing party to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed. The claims of each Plaintiff shall be severed from those of the other Plaintiff. Plaintiff Witherspoon's claims shall proceed under this case number. The Clerk is directed to open a new case for the claims of each remaining Plaintiff. The 13 cases are related within the meaning of Western District of Michigan Local Civil Rule 3.3.1(d) ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $6.00, receipt number MQ006253; amount paid to date $92.76 (amount paid to date by Plaintiff Antonio Taylor: $30.92) (mlc) Modified text on 5/21/2021 (mlc).
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #10 Plaintiff Antonio Taylor's motion for order to refund excess filing fee. Plaintiff Taylor to submit remaining $6 of his portion of the filing fee in 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion for Order #14 sent via U.S. Mail to to all plaintiffs (mlc)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REJECTING Motion Seeking Permission to Join Pending Action submitted by numerous inmates ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Attachments: #1 Rejected Document) (cam)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #13 with rejected documents sent via U.S. Mail to Kerrick Farquharson #538192 (mlc)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REJECTING Financial Documents submitted by Bowman #983664 and Frederick #418636 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Attachments: #1 Rejected Documents) (cam)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #12 with rejected documents sent via U.S. Mail to Derrick Bowman #983664 and Maurice Frederick #418636 (mlc) Modified text on 5/5/2021 (mlc).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Denying IFP (Able to Pay - Prisoner Civil Rights), #11 sent via U.S. Mail to all Plaintiffs (slk)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING IFP: Plaintiff Kelly to pay this $30.92 proportionate share of the civil action filing fee within 28 days or the case will be dismissed;filing fee to be submitted by 5/14/2021; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for order to refund filing fees by plaintiff Antonio Taylor #618544; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (slk)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account and a Six Month Trust Account Statement submitted by plaintiff Michael Kelly #781124 to cure deficiency (slk)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $30.92, receipt number MQ006228; amount paid to date $61.84 (amount paid to date by Plaintiff Regains: $30.92) (slk)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $24.92, receipt number MQ006229; amount paid to date $86.76 (amount paid to date by Plaintiff Antonio Taylor: $24.92) (slk) Modified text on 4/13/2021 (slk).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $30.92, receipt number MQ006227; amount paid to date $30.92 (amount paid by Plaintiff Webb $30.92) (mlc)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER from plaintiff Devonte Dorsey #967089 requesting docket sheet; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk Memo) (mlc)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER from plaintiff Norwood Witherspoon #484291 requesting docket sheet; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk Memo) (mlc)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order #6 sent via U.S. Mail to all plaintiffs and to the Michigan Department of Corrections via e-mail (slk)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER from plaintiff Larry Stovall #601852 requesting docket sheet; (mailed docket sheet to Larry Stoval) (slk)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 (Jabari Regains financial documents) by plaintiff Jabari Regains #600539 (slk)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 (Larry Stovall financial documents) by plaintiff Larry Stovall #601852 (slk)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiffs Devonte Dorsey #967089, Michael Kelly #781124, Jaylen McCoy #793044, Jabari Regains #600539, Larry Stovall #601852, Christopher Michael Taylor #408375, Antonio Taylor #618544, Keith Thomas #436056, Demetric Thompkins #575337, Anthony Wallace #705595, Oliver Webb #283528, IV, Raymond Williams #688523, Norwood Witherspoon #484291; (Attachments: #1 Norwood Witherspoon Financial Documents, #2 Devonte Dorsey Financial Documents, #3 Demetric Thompkins Financial Documents, #4 Christopher M. Taylor Financial Documents, #5 Raymond Williams Financial Documents, #6 Jaylen McCoy Financial Documents, #7 Keith Thomas Financial Documents, #8 Antonio Taylor Financial Documents, #9 Anthony Wallace Financial Documents, #10 Oliver Webb Financial Documents) (slk)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Anthony Wallace #705595, Raymond Williams #688523, Devonte Dorsey #967089, Norwood Witherspoon #484291, Oliver Webb #283528, IV, Christopher Michael Taylor #408375, Michael Kelly #781124, Keith Thomas #436056, Larry Stovall #601852, Jaylen McCoy #793044, Demetric Thompkins #575337, Antonio Taylor #618544, Jabari Regains #600539 (slk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompkins #575337 v. Binner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Binner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Vinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Whitlar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lamentola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bemister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetric Thompkins #575337
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?