McCandless v. Forever Resorts, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Beverly McCandless
Defendant: Forever Resorts, LLC dba Rock Harbor Lodge, Forever Living Products International LLC, Isle Royale Resorts, LLC and Forever Resorts, LLC doing business as Rock Harbor Lodge
Case Number: 2:2021cv00232
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that attorney Steven W. Reifman must register as an electronic filer by 1/31/2022; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal as to defendant Forever Living Products International LLC only; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 3, 2022 Certified Copy of Stipulation and Order #17 sent via U.S. Mail to attorney Steven W. Reifman, attorney Kate L. Kasperek (ems)
January 3, 2022 Copy of Order Regarding Mandatory E-Filing and Service #18 sent via U.S. Mail to attorney Steven W. Reifman (ems)
December 30, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Kate L. Kasperek; attorney admission deadline set for 1/27/2022; (ems) Modified text on 12/30/2021 (ems).
December 29, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Forever Living Products International LLC Only by defendants Forever Living Products International LLC, Forever Resorts, LLC, Isle Royale Resorts, LLC (Cross, Matthew)
December 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Reliance on Jury Demand by defendants Forever Living Products International LLC, Forever Resorts, LLC, Isle Royale Resorts, LLC (Cross, Matthew)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 1/26/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 1/20/2022 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
December 8, 2021 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone, #13 sent via U.S. Mail to attorney Steven W. Reifman (ems)
November 29, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Randy Calvin on behalf of plaintiff Beverly McCandless (Calvin, Randy)
November 24, 2021 Copy of Order #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven W. Reifman (mlc)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER acknowledging jurisdiction ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Forever Living Products International LLC, Forever Resorts, LLC, Isle Royale Resorts, LLC re Brief (Related Document) #10 , Answer to Complaint #9 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 (Cross, Matthew)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE by defendants Forever Living Products International LLC, Forever Resorts, LLC, Isle Royale Resorts, LLC to Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #5 (with Exhibits A-C) (Cross, Matthew) Modified text on 11/19/2021 (ems).
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses by Forever Living Products International LLC, Forever Resorts, LLC, Isle Royale Resorts, LLC (Cross, Matthew) Modified text on 11/19/2021 (ems).
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Isle Royale Resorts, LLC (Cross, Matthew)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Forever Living Products International LLC identifying Corporate Parent Forever International Holdings, LLC (Cross, Matthew) Modified text on 11/19/2021 (ems).
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Forever Resorts, LLC (Cross, Matthew)
November 18, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew W. Cross on behalf of defendants Forever Living Products International LLC, Forever Resorts, LLC, Isle Royale Resorts, LLC (Cross, Matthew)
November 18, 2021 Copy of Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to attorney Steven W. Reifman (ems)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants to show cause by 12/1/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Steven W. Reifman; attorney admission deadline set for 12/13/2021; (ems)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to attorney Thomas L. Cooper regarding recent filing #1 (ems)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
November 15, 2021 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #2 sent via U.S. Mail to attorney Steven W. Reifman (ems)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Keweenaw County Circuit Court case number 21-831-NO filed by Isle Royale Resorts, LLC, Forever Living Products International LLC, Forever Resorts, LLC dba Rock Harbor Lodge (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Index, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D) (Cooper, Thomas)
November 12, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Forever Living Products International LLC, Forever Resorts, LLC, Isle Royale Resorts, LLC in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6594321 (Cooper, Thomas) Modified text on 11/15/2021 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCandless v. Forever Resorts, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly McCandless
Represented By: Steven W. Reifman
Represented By: Kate L. Kasperek
Represented By: Randy Calvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Resorts, LLC dba Rock Harbor Lodge
Represented By: Thomas L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Living Products International LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew W. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isle Royale Resorts, LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew W. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Resorts, LLC doing business as Rock Harbor Lodge
Represented By: Matthew W. Cross
Represented By: Thomas L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?