Clark #868212 v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: Dimitrus A. Clark #868212
Defendant: Heidi E. Washington, Erica Huss, Unknown Pelky, Unknown Snively, Unknown Kessler, Unknown Thornington, Unknown Minthorn, Unknown Pucel, Unknown Travis, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Stacy, Peggy Erickson, Thomas Mohrman, Mark W. Hares, Unknown Part(y)(ies) and Heidi Washington
Case Number: 2:2022cv00073
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Peggy Erickson, Erica Huss, Unknown Pelky, Heidi Washington re Attorney Appearance (Limited), (Raines, Austin)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Austin Curtis Raines on behalf of defendants Peggy Erickson, Erica Huss, Unknown Pelky, Heidi Washington for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Raines, Austin)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by May 23, 2022; w/attached Protocol; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (kmd)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order (DISREGARD) Certified Copy of Order #27 , Opinion (Screening) #26 sent via U.S. Mail to Dimitrus A. Clark #868212 (klb) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (pjw).
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #28 sent via U.S. Mail to Dimitrus A. Clark #868212 (jmw)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (DISREGARD) ORDER for Partial Dismissal and Resolving Motion #22 ; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (alm) Modified on 5/2/2022 per chambers, duplicate of #25 (pjw).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (DISREGARD) OPINION; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (alm) Modified text on 5/2/2022 per chambers; duplicate of #24 (pjw).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Partial Dismissal and Resolving Motion #22 ; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (alm)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (alm)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Certified Copy of Order #25 , and Opinion (Screening) #24 sent via U.S. Mail to Dimitrus A. Clark #868212 (klb)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER from Dimitrus A. Clark #868212 regarding copies. (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk) (ns)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Peggy Erickson, Erica Huss, Unknown Kessler, Unknown Minthorn, Unknown Pelky, Heidi Washington filed by Dimitrus A. Clark #868212 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K) (ns)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Certified Copy of Order #20 , Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form #21 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Demario Johnson #857142 (ems)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Certified Copy of Order #20 , Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form #21 , along with amended complaint form and respective docket sheet for new severed cases sent via U.S. Mail to Teywon Beckham #595348, Marcus Howell #872975, Dimitrus A. Clark #868212, Dannel Christopher Hammond #670336, Edward James Cromer #211902 (ems)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER severing claims of remaining Plaintiffs and directing Plaintiffs to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff Charles Demario Johnson; denying Plaintiff Johnson's motion #11 for temporary restraining order; initial filing fees due: Teywon Beckham $30.01, Marcus Howell $2.98, Dimitrus A. Clark $35.09, Dannel Christopher Hammond $6.31; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SIGNATURE PAGE submitted by plaintiff Edward James Cromer #211902 for Supplement #15 (ems)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER from plaintiff Edward James Cromer #211902 requesting forms and confirmation of recent payment; Response from Clerk, docket sheet, and (3) 42 USC 1983 Complaint forms mailed to plaintiff on 3/16/22 (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk) (ems)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Activity (dated 3/7/22) and Daily Transaction Summary from September 7, 2021 through March 7, 2022 submitted by plaintiff Dimitrus A. Clark #868212 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ems)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONDITIONAL ORDER striking Supplement #15 unless the filing party submits a signature page within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Conditional Order Striking Pleading or Other Paper #16 sent via U.S. Mail to Edward James Cromer #211902 (ems)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (SEE SIGNATURE PAGE #19 ) UNSIGNED SUPPLEMENT re Amended Complaint #9 by plaintiff Edward James Cromer #211902 (ems) Modified text on 3/14/2022 (ems). Modified text on 3/26/2022 (cam).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $67.00 by Edward James Cromer #211902, receipt number KZ004400; amount paid to date by Edward James Cromer #211902 $67.00; amount paid to date by Charles Demario Johnson #857142 $0.00; amount paid to date by Teywon Beckham #595348; amount paid to date by Marcus Howell #872975 $0.00; amount paid to date by Dimitrus A. Clark #868212 $0.00; amount paid to date by Dannel Christopher Hammond #670336 $0.00; TOTAL amount paid to date for case $67.00 (ems)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Activity (dated 2/22/22) and Daily Transaction Summary from August 22, 2021 through February 22, 2022 submitted by plaintiff Teywon Beckham #595348 to cure deficiency (ems)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Activity (dated 2/22/22) and Daily Transactions Summary from August 22, 2021 through February 22, 2022 submitted by plaintiff Marcus Howell #872975 to cure deficiency (ems)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Activity (dated 2/23/22) and Daily Transactions Summary from August 23, 2021 through February 23, 2022 submitted by plaintiff Dannel Christopher Hammond #670336 to cure deficiency (ems)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Charles Demario Johnson #857142; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ems)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 3/16/2022 or the action will be dismissed, filing fee to be submitted by 3/16/2022; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (alm)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Deficiency Order, #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Demario Johnson #857142, Teywon Beckham #595348, Marcus Howell #872975, Dimitrus A. Clark #868212, Dannel Christopher Hammond #670336, Edward James Cromer #211902 (ems)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand against Peggy Erickson, Mark W. Hares, Erica Huss, Unknown Kessler, Unknown Minthorn, Thomas Mohrman, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Pelky, Unknown Pucel, Unknown Snively, Unknown Stacy, Unknown Thornington, Unknown Travis, Heidi E. Washington filed by Charles Demario Johnson #857142, Dannel Christopher Hammond #670336, Marcus Howell #872975, Edward James Cromer #211902, Dimitrus A. Clark #868212, Teywon Beckham #595348 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H (cover page only), #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (ems)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou and Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat for all further proceedings (ems)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Charles Demario Johnson #857142 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (ems)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SIGNATURE PAGE submitted by plaintiff Charles Demario Johnson #857142 for complaint #1 (ems)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Affidavit of Indigence, Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Activity (dated 1/26/22), Daily Transaction Summary for July 26, 2021 through January 26, 2022, and Cover Letter submitted by plaintiff Charles Demario Johnson #857142 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents, #2 Cover Letter) (ems)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Demario Johnson #857142 (ems)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 3/1/2022 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONDITIONAL ORDER striking complaint #1 unless the filing party submits a signature page within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 2/22/2022 (ems)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Demario Johnson #857142 (ems)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Conditional Order Striking Pleading or Other Paper #3 , Deficiency Order, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Demario Johnson #857142 (ems)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (SEE SIGNATURE PAGE #6 ) UNSIGNED COMPLAINT against Unknown Part(y)(ies), Heidi E. Washington filed by Charles Demario Johnson #857142 (ems) Modified text on 2/1/2022 (ems). Modified text on 2/10/2022 (cam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark #868212 v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimitrus A. Clark #868212
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi E. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Huss
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pelky
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Snively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Thornington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Minthorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pucel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Erickson
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark W. Hares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?