Willis v. Huss et al
Plaintiff: Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections, Erica, Warden Huss, Mark Cavin, Megan Neubecker, Drew Ogle, Unknown Brennan, Unknown Cobb, Jeffrey Contreras, Keith Pelky, Charlie Scott, Peggy Erickson, Darrin Viitala, Amy Westcomb, Jamie Koski, Brenda James, Ruth Jones, Eric Chang, Corizon Health, Inc., Erica Huss and Wellpath LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00211
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned unexecuted as to Michigan Department of Corrections, filed by plaintiff Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis (Nunley, Royce)
December 27, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis as to Drew Ogle waiver sent on 11/29/2022, answer due 1/30/2023 (Nunley, Royce)
December 27, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis as to Brenda James waiver sent on 11/29/2022, answer due 1/30/2023 (Nunley, Royce)
December 21, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis as to Peggy Erickson waiver sent on 11/29/2022, answer due 1/30/2023 (Nunley, Royce)
December 20, 2022 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis, Unknown Brennan, Mark Cavin, Eric Chang, Unknown Cobb, Jeffrey Contreras, Corizon Health, Inc., Peggy Erickson, Erica Huss, Brenda James, Ruth Jones, Jamie Koski, Michigan Department of Corrections, Megan Neubecker, Drew Ogle, Keith Pelky, Charlie Scott, Darrin Viitala, Amy Westcomb, Wellpath LLC filed by Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis (Nunley, Royce)
December 20, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis as to Amy Westcomb waiver sent on 11/29/2022, answer due 1/30/2023 (Nunley, Royce)
December 20, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis as to Eric Chang waiver sent on 11/29/2022, answer due 1/30/2023 (Nunley, Royce)
December 20, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis as to Megan Neubecker waiver sent on 11/29/2022, answer due 1/30/2023 (Nunley, Royce)
December 20, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis as to Mark Cavin waiver sent on 11/29/2022, answer due 1/30/2023 (Nunley, Royce)
December 20, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joshua Lee Hadley on behalf of plaintiff Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis (Hadley, Joshua)
December 15, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John Charles Cardello on behalf of defendants Eric Chang, Amy Westcomb (Cardello, John)
December 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to District Judge Paul L. Maloney and Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat for all further proceedings (eod)
November 18, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Unknown Brennan, Mark Cavin, Eric Chang, Unknown Cobb, Jeffrey Contreras, Corizon Health, Inc., Peggy Erickson, Erica Huss, Brenda James, Ruth Jones, Jamie Koski, Michigan Department of Corrections, Megan Neubecker, Drew Ogle, Keith Pelky, Charlie Scott, Darrin Viitala, Amy Westcomb (eod)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER LIFTING STAY and REGARDING SERVICE: the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the defendants; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM EARLY MEDIATION re #5 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (kmd)
November 16, 2022 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF CASE by plaintiff Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis Statement to exclude plaintiff from early mediation program (Nunley, Royce)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by December 7, 2022; w/attached Protocol; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (kmd)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 12/1/2022 (eod)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 (DISREGARD) NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 12/1/2022 (eod) Modified text on 11/10/2022, replaced by #3 (eod)
November 10, 2022 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Unknown Brennan, Mark Cavin, Eric Chang, Unknown Cobb, Jeffrey Contreras, Corizon Health, Inc., Peggy Erickson, Erica Huss, Brenda James, Ruth Jones, Jamie Koski, Michigan Department of Corrections, Megan Neubecker, Drew Ogle, Keith Pelky, Charlie Scott, Darrin Viitala, Amy Westcomb (case type) (eod)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Nunley, Royce)
November 9, 2022 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6896046 (Nunley, Royce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Huss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amon Alexander-Hassa Willis
Represented By: Royce Asher Nunley
Represented By: Joshua Lee Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica, Warden Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Neubecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Ogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Pelky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Viitala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Westcomb
Represented By: John Charles Cardello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Koski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Chang
Represented By: John Charles Cardello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?