August 19, 2022 |
Filing
1917
FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL: Ordered that this case is dismissed with prejudice as to all parties. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 8/19/22. (JCH)
|
March 26, 2021 |
Filing
1678
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's Motion 1634 to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and denying Defendant's Motion 1632 to Dismiss Relators Cori Rigsby and Kerri Rigsby's Second Amended Complaint 1623 . Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on March 26, 2021. (ENW)
|
December 12, 2019 |
Filing
1570
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1507 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 12, 2019 (King, Steve)
|
September 18, 2018 |
Filing
1416
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1348 Motion to Compel; denying 1375 Motion for Leave to File Sur-rebuttal in Opposition to 1348 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 18, 2018 (King, Steve)
|
September 27, 2017 |
Filing
1341
ORDER granting Relators' 1299 Motion to Extinguish Gilbert LLP's Lien, denying Gilbert LLP's 1311 Counter-Motion to Set Value of Lien, and extinguishing Gilbert LLP's 991 Lien. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on September 27, 2017. (ENW)
|
May 27, 2016 |
Filing
1279
ORDER denying Relators' 1242 Motion to Dismiss and for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on May 27, 2016. (ENW)
|
February 21, 2014 |
Filing
1128
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Relators' 1104 Motion to Initiate Discovery, Impose Maximum Penalty, Award Maximum Relators' Share, and Award Relators Their Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Costs. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 2/21/2014. (ENW)
|
December 5, 2011 |
Filing
904
ORDER granting 902 Motion to Lift Stay and Reinstate Case on Active Docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 12/5/11 (RLW)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing
898
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 734 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 9/30/2011. (ENW)
|
April 4, 2011 |
Filing
890
ORDER CORRECTING ERROR OF FACT CONCERNING PRIOR REPRESENTATION OF THE RELATORS IN MEMORANDUM OPINION 871 . Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 04/04/2011 (kbo)
|
January 24, 2011 |
Filing
872
ORDER ORDER DENYING STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY'S MOTION 739 TO DISMISS FOR RELATORS' VIOLATION OF SEAL ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 01/24/2011 (kbo)
|
January 7, 2011 |
Filing
870
ORDER DENYING STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY'S MOTION 844 TO RECONSIDER DECISION DENYING ITS MOTIONS 300 706 TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF DAVID FAVRE. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on(kbo)
|
December 9, 2010 |
Filing
841
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION 687 OF STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF CERTAIN WITNESSES ON THE GROUNDS OF UNTIMELY DISCLOSURE BY RELATORS. State Farm may depose these witnesses within thirty days of the date of this opinion and order. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 12/09/2010 (kbo)
|
November 29, 2010 |
Filing
835
ORDER GRANTING MOTION 799 OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO DISMISS FORENSIC ANALYSIS AND ENGINEERING CORP. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 11/29/2010 (kbo)
|
November 23, 2010 |
Filing
829
ORDER DENYING STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY'S SEALED MOTION 756 TO DECLASSIFY PORTIONS OF NON-PARTY REARDON GROUP'S RULE 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION FROM "PROTECTED INFORMATION" STATUS UNDER THE CONSENT ORDER 406 ENTERED ON JAN UARY 27, 2010, AND GRANTING STATE FARM LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL ANY OR ALL OF THESE DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS PENDING MOTION 739 TO DISMISS. The order allows State Farm a period of ten days from the date of this order to make these submissions under seal. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 11/23/2010 (kbo)
|
November 18, 2010 |
Filing
824
ORDER GRANTING STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE 707 EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JOHN A. FOWLER, P.E. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 11/18/2010 (kbo)
|
October 26, 2010 |
Filing
802
ORDER DENYING State Farm Insurance Company's 794 Motion for use of a supplemental questionnaire addressed to potential jurors in this action. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 10/26/2010 (kbo)
|
October 5, 2010 |
Filing
790
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 723 MOTION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL 713 OF FORENSIC ANALYSIS AND ENGINEERING, INC. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 10/05/2010 (kbo)
|
September 2, 2010 |
Filing
760
ORDER DENYING STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY'S 709 MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF LOUIS G. FEY, JR. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 09/02/2010 (kbo)
|
August 25, 2010 |
Filing
752
ORDER denying State Farm's 298 Motion to Exclude; denying State Farm's 715 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 08/24/2010 (kbo)
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing
720
ORDER denying State Farm's 294 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Patrick J. Fitzpatrick; denying State Farm's 296 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Keith G. Blackwell; denying State Farm's 705 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Patrick J. Fitzpatrick; denying State Farm's 719 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Keith G. Blackwell. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 08/04/2010 (kbo)
|
July 13, 2010 |
Filing
689
ORDER denying 665 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 13, 2010 (King, Steve)
|
July 9, 2010 |
Filing
684
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 671 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 9, 2010 (King, Steve)
|
May 27, 2010 |
Filing
544
ORDER granting Relators' 539 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79 Relators' Response in Objection to Haag Engineering Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 05/27/2010 (kbo)
|
September 24, 2009 |
Filing
363
ORDER bifurcating the trial of these two claims, staying discovery on State Farm Insurance Company's counterclaim until the trial of the Relators' claim has been completed, and scheduling a separate trial to reach the merits of the counterc laim. United States Magistrate Judge Walker will establish a pre-trial schedule for the trial of the Relators' claim, and, after the merits of that claim have been tried, he will establish a pre-trial schedule for the counterclaim. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 09/24/2009 (kbo)
|
September 11, 2009 |
Filing
360
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR STATE FARM'S IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF LIST OF PROPERTIES: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company shall submit the list called for under item number 6 in order 344 of August 10, 2009, within thirty days of the date of this Supplemental Order, i.e. on or before the close of business on October 19, 2009. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 09/11/2009 (kbo)
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing
344
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' unopposed 340 Motion for Leave to File; DENYING State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's 91 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; GRANTING State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's 96 Motion for Summar y Judgment; DENYING State Farm Fire Insurance Company's 98 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING Haag Engineering Company's 106 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; DENYING Haag Engineering Company's 108 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING R elators' 206 Motion to Clarify the Order excluding their testimony in civil actions against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. To the extent the Relators have relevant knowledge, they will be permitted to testify in all further proceedings in this action. Further proceedings in this action shall be limited to the specific allegations of the Amended Complaint, i.e. to the allegation the payment of the limits of SFIP coverage on the McIntosh property and the presentment of a claim for reimbursement to the United States of America constitutes a violation of the FCA. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company shall submit, in camera, a list containing the name of the insured, the address of the insured property, and the amount of flood insurance paid, for all SFIP claims that meet three criteria. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 08/10/2009 (kbo)
|
May 18, 2009 |
Filing
319
ORDER: Granting 284 Relators' Motion to Dismiss ONLY Defendants E. A. Renfroe & Company, Inc., Gene Renfroe, and Jana Renfroe, WITH PREJUDICE as to Relators, and WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the United States of America ; each party shall bear its own costs; ORDER finding as moot 115 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 179 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 181 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge L. T. Senter, Jr on 5/18/2009. (Peters, Catherine)
|
April 28, 2009 |
Filing
287
ORDER re Relators' 284 motion to voluntarily dismiss Counts I through IV as to Defendants E.A. Renfroe & Company, Inc., Gene Renfroe, and Jana Renfroe. A period of fifteen days from the date of this order shall be allowed within which the Uni ted States may file its objection, if any, to the dismissal of Counts I through IV as to Defendants E.A. Renfroe & Company, Inc., Gene Renfroe, and Jana Renfroe. If the United States files no objection on or before the expiration of the fifteen-day period, it will be considered as consent to the relief requested, and the Relators motion will be granted. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 04/28/2009 (kbo)
|
April 20, 2009 |
Filing
274
ORDER: All parties shall arrange for and schedule the discovery allowed by the order. The Court will schedule a pre-hearing conference in the near future. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 04/20/2009 (kbo)
|
March 20, 2009 |
Filing
266
ORDER CONCERNING DISCOVERY PRIOR TO HEARING ON CONSOLIDATED MOTIONS: The Court orders the Relators, on or before noon on Friday, March 27, 2009, to submit a concise summary of their reasons for wishing to depose Mike Church, Ron Muchk, and Linda Much k. This summary should state clearly the information the Relators expect these individuals to have and the relationship that information has to the McIntosh flood claim. The Court will not approve the deposition of any person who is not directly in volved with State Farm's investigation and payment of the McIntosh flood claim. The Court requires the defendants to state, on or before noon on Friday April 3, 2009, whether they object to the production of the documents listed above and wheth er they object to allowing the Relators to take the depositions of all or any of these seven witnesses. If the defendants do object, they are to state the grounds for their objections with reasonable particularity. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 03/20/2009 (kbo)
|
February 12, 2009 |
Filing
261
ORDER denying Relators' 212 Motion ; granting Relators' 214 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (Responses due by 3/2/2009); granting Relators' 215 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; granting State Farm's 226 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying Relators' 230 Motion. The Court will schedule a hearing on the pending motions. Signed by District Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 02/12/2009 (kbo)
|
January 5, 2009 |
Filing
260
ORDER granting Relators' unopposed 242 Motion to Dismiss; granting Relators' unopposed 243 Motion to Dismiss; granting Relators' unopposed 248 Motion to Dismiss; granting Relators' unopposed 250 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 01/05/2009 (kbo)
|
November 17, 2008 |
Filing
251
ORDER: If the United States files no objection on or before January 17, 2009, the Relators' motions 242 243 248 250 to dismiss this action as to Rimkus Consulting Group, Inc., Jade Engineering, Exponent, Inc., and Structures Group will be GRANTED. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 11/14/2008 (kbo)
|