Blades v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01000
Filed: October 4, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Presiding Judge: John M. Roper
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of defendants pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1); all remaining pending motions are denied as moot and this civil action is hereby dismissed. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 11/5/2009.(avm)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting 253 Motion for Summary Judgment. This case will proceed against the remaining defendants. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 10/29/09 (wld)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER denying 212 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 3/27/2009. (YSM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blades v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?