Bailey Lumber & Supply Co. et al v. Georgia-Pacific Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Bailey Lumber & Supply Co. and 84 Lumber Company
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Bluelinx Corporation and Weyerhaeuser Company
Case Number: 1:2008cv01394
Filed: November 12, 2008
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Anti-Trust Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Halil S. Ozerden
Referring Judge: John M. Roper
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 122 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 04/14/10 (Guirola, Louis)
March 19, 2010 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion to Dismiss; denying 96 Motion to Strike Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 03/19/10 (Guirola, Louis)
February 25, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 99 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against BlueLinx Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 2/25/10. (RLW)
August 6, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion to Dismiss Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 08/06/09 (Guirola, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey Lumber & Supply Co. et al v. Georgia-Pacific Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bailey Lumber & Supply Co.
Represented By: Ronald G. Peresich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 84 Lumber Company
Represented By: Ronald G. Peresich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluelinx Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?