Atlantic Sounding Co., Inc. v. Vickers
Plaintiff: Atlantic Sounding Co., Inc.
Defendant: Jimmie Vickers
Case Number: 1:2009cv00346
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Halil S. Ozerden
Presiding Judge: John M. Roper
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT: Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 4/4/2011 (wld)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 2/24/2011 (wld)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Summary Judgment.Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 9/7/2010. (Brown, T.)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 46 Motion to Strike; denying 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 6/11/2010. (Brown, T.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Sounding Co., Inc. v. Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Sounding Co., Inc.
Represented By: Richard P. Salloum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?