Gazzo v. Mississippi Department of Public Safety et al
Plaintiff: Joseph F. Gazzo, II
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Public Safety, George Phillips, Charles V. Williams, Stephen Simpson, Houston Dorr, John Perkins and John Does 1-2
Case Number: 1:2009cv00719
Filed: October 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 81 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 87 Motion Rule 56(d) Relief Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 05/13/2011 (Guirola, Louis)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 42 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff granted 30 days to complete service of process. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 07/14/2010 (Guirola, Louis)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Dismiss Simpson. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 5/14/2010. (BR)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss; denying 23 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 1/27/10 (Guirola, Louis)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gazzo v. Mississippi Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph F. Gazzo, II
Represented By: Kaye Johnson Persons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Wilson D. Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Phillips
Represented By: P. Roger Googe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles V. Williams
Represented By: Ricky G. Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Simpson
Represented By: Royce M. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Dorr
Represented By: Shawn Stephen Shurden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Perkins
Represented By: Lisa L. Colonias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?