Automotive Rentals, Inc. et al v. PACCAR, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Automotive Rentals, Inc. and Siemens Water Technologies Corp.
Defendant: PACCAR Inc. and Caterpillar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00434
Filed: September 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2011 Filing 22 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Defendants Caterpillar Inc., and PACCAR Inc. dba Kenworth Truck Company dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 6/15/2011 (wld)
October 27, 2010 Cases 1:10cv385 and 1:10cv434 associated. (wld)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 27, 2010 (King, Steve)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to change the name of defendant from Kenworth Truck Company, a Division of PACCAR, to PACCAR Inc. d/b/a Kenworth Truck Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/26/2010. (Joffe, Scherry)
October 22, 2010 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION Correct Name by Kenworth Truck Company (Jicka, Mark)
October 21, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Automotive Rentals, Inc., Siemens Water Technologies Corp. (Colmer, James)
October 20, 2010 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #17: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 84, appendix form 2 states that date, signature, address, e-mail address and telephone number are used at the conclusion of pleadings and other papers that require a signature. Document is undated, but the date will be construed as the date of electronic filing. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (RLW)
October 19, 2010 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Caterpillar, Inc..(Schelver, Stephen)
October 18, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David Aaron Norris on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Norris, David)
October 18, 2010 Filing 15 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2010 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker (JR)
October 15, 2010 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12 thru #14: Advising attorney that Defendant's name is listed incorrectly in the first paragraph and under the respectfully submitted portion of the document. In the future, attorney is advised to list the defendant's name as filed in Complaint. (RLW)
October 14, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd J. Hartley on behalf of Kenworth Truck Company (Hartley, Todd)
October 14, 2010 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kenworth Truck Company (Jicka, Mark)
October 14, 2010 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kenworth Truck Company.(Jicka, Mark)
October 14, 2010 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
October 11, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. Payne on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Payne, Jason)
October 8, 2010 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
October 8, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen F. Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Caterpillar, Inc. answer due 10/22/2010. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 8, 2010. (Joffe, Scherry)
October 5, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Automotive Rentals, Inc., Siemens Water Technologies Corp. Kenworth Truck Company served on 9/23/2010, answer due 10/14/2010. (Colmer, James)
September 24, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Automotive Rentals, Inc. Caterpillar, Inc. served on 9/17/2010, answer due 10/8/2010. (Colmer, James)
September 14, 2010 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to Kenworth Truck Company. (RLW)
September 14, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Automotive Rentals, Inc. as to Kenworth Truck Company. (Colmer, James)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. Summons Returned Unexecuted by Automotive Rentals, Inc. as to Kenworth Truck Company. (Colmer, James) Modified on 9/14/2010 (RLW).
September 14, 2010 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (RLW)
September 10, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Caterpillar, Inc., Kenworth Truck Company. (RLW)
September 10, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caterpillar, Inc., Kenworth Truck Company (Filing fee $350.00, receipt number 14643001269), filed by Automotive Rentals, Inc., Siemens Water Technologies Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Automotive Rentals, Inc. et al v. PACCAR, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR Inc.
Represented By: Todd J. Hartley
Represented By: Mark D. Jicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: David Aaron Norris
Represented By: Stephen F. Schelver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automotive Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: James H. Colmer, Jr.
Represented By: Jason M. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siemens Water Technologies Corp.
Represented By: James H. Colmer, Jr.
Represented By: Jason M. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?