Duckworth v. Goff
Plaintiff: Elnorsh Duckworth
Defendant: Preston Goff
Case Number: 1:2011cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: George
Presiding Judge: Halil S. Ozerden
Presiding Judge: John M. Roper
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Amended Brief in Support of Habeas Petition 27 ; adopting Report and Recommendations 31 . Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 8/9/2012. (Brown, T.)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Certificate of Appealability Denied re 19 Notice of Appeal. A Certificate of Appealability should not issue. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 10/21/11. (JCH)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINAL JUDGMENT: Ordered that the Petition is dismissed as time barred. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 9/28/11. (JCH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duckworth v. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Goff
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elnorsh Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?