Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. LHC Group Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: LHC Group Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00355
Filed: September 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Pearl River
Presiding Judge: John M. Roper
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 FINAL JUDGMENT: Ordered that this case is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and expenses. The Clerk is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment and to close the file. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 7/27/15 (RLW)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER denying 193 Motion to Exclude Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 05/22/2013 (Guirola, Louis)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting 229 Motion to Strike pages 41 through 52 of 220 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion ; denying 230 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 5/16/13. (Whitsitt, K)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Strike 8 Answer to Amended Complaint Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 07/07/2012 (Guirola, Louis)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. LHC Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Julie Steptoe Bean
Represented By: C. Emanuel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LHC Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?