Full House Resorts, Inc. et al v. Boggs & Poole Contracting Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Full House Resorts, Inc. and Silver Slipper Casino Venture, LLC
Defendant: Boggs & Poole Contracting Group, Inc. and Ronald Lustig
Case Number: 1:2014cv00223
Filed: May 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Plaintiffs have until on or before August 23, 2017 to file any responses to Motions in Limine 193 , 195 and 197 . Defendant has until on or before August 30, 2017, to file any rebuttals. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/17/2017 (dtj)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Plaintiffs have until on or before August 4, 2017, to file a response to Motion to Substitute Expert Witness 188 . Movant will then be given until or or before August 9, 2017, to file any rebuttal. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/31/2017 (dtj)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER denying Defendant Boggs' 156 Motion for Sanctions; and denying as moot Defendant Boggs' 167 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on December 23, 2015 (dsl)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 JUDGMENT: Ordered that the Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed with prejudice and this case is closed. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 10/5/2015. (JCH)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 128 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 130 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 10/5/2015 (scp)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying 114 Motion to Compel and denying 137 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 22, 2015. (js)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 7 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 17 Motion to Strike - both without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 3/27/2015 (scp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Full House Resorts, Inc. et al v. Boggs & Poole Contracting Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Full House Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Lassiter
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Slipper Casino Venture, LLC
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Lassiter
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boggs & Poole Contracting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Solop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Lustig
Represented By: Judson R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?