Jones et al v. Singing River Health Services Foundation et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Jones, Joseph Charles Lohfink, Sue Beavers, Rodolfoa Rel and Hazel Reed Thomas
Defendant: Singing River Health Services Foundation, Singing River Health System Foundation, Singing River Hospital System Foundation, Inc., Singing River Hospital System Employee Benefit Fund, Inc., Singing River Hospital System, Transamerica Retirement Solutions Corporation, KPMG, LLP, Michael J. Heidelberg, Michael D. Tolleson, Tommy Leonard, Lawrence H. Cosper, Morris G. Strickland, Ira Polk, Stephen Nunenmacher, Hugo Quintana, Chris Anderson, Stephanie Barnes Taylor, Michael Crews and Singing River Health System
Case Number: 1:2014cv00447
Filed: December 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 1/26/2018 (wld)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER: NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD concerning Supplemental Fairness Hearing scheduled for January 22, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 1/17/2018. (BR)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER denying 344 Motion Lift Stay; denying 345 Motion Lift Stay Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/15/2017 (Guirola, Louis)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER SEVERING CLAIMS Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 11/9/2017 (wld)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER denying 338 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 9/15/2017. (BR)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 302 AMENDED ORDER AND JUDGMENT Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 6/28/2016. (BR)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 6/16/2016 (wld)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting 198 Motion to Stay Proceedings Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 06/15/2016 (Guirola, Louis)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting 164 Motion for Attorney Fees, Expenses, Costs, and Incentive Fee. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 06/10/2016 (Guirola, Louis)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER re 261 Stipulation filed by Jessie Carl Beasley, Sr., Hazel Reed Thomas, Rodolfoa Rel, Sue Beavers, Thomas Jones, and Joseph Charles Lohfink. The parties stipulate that the Beasley Objectors are not members of the proposed class. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 5/16/2016. (BR)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting 241 Motion to Quash; granting 244 Motion to Quash; granting 249 Motion to Quash Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 05/13/2016 (Guirola, Louis)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 154 Motion to Compel; granting 154 Motion to Stay Proceedings; denying 154 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 03/29/2016 (Guirola, Louis)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE AND MEMORANDUM BRIEF re 89 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration as to KPMG LLP or, in the alternative MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims as to KPMG LLP MOTION to Stay Case re 76 Amended Complaint pursuant to Local Rule 16(b)(3)(B) filed by KPMG, LLP Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 07/27/2015 (Guirola, Louis)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Singing River Health Services Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jones
Represented By: James R. Reeves, Jr.
Represented By: Lucy Elizabeth Tufts - PHV
Represented By: David G. Wirtes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Charles Lohfink
Represented By: James R. Reeves, Jr.
Represented By: Lucy Elizabeth Tufts - PHV
Represented By: David G. Wirtes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Beavers
Represented By: James R. Reeves, Jr.
Represented By: Lucy Elizabeth Tufts - PHV
Represented By: David G. Wirtes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfoa Rel
Represented By: James R. Reeves, Jr.
Represented By: Lucy Elizabeth Tufts - PHV
Represented By: David G. Wirtes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Reed Thomas
Represented By: James R. Reeves, Jr.
Represented By: Lucy Elizabeth Tufts - PHV
Represented By: David G. Wirtes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singing River Health Services Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singing River Health System Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singing River Hospital System Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singing River Hospital System Employee Benefit Fund, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singing River Hospital System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Retirement Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Ashley Eley Cannady
Represented By: Armin J. Moeller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPMG, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Tolleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence H. Cosper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris G. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Nunenmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Barnes Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singing River Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?