Richards v. Mark Gibson, HL & C Jackson, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly Richards
Defendant: Mark Gibson, HL & C Jackson, LLC and Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00007
Filed: January 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JUDGMENT: judgment is rendered in favor of Plaintiff Kimberly Richards and against Defendants Mark Gibson and HL & C Jackson, LLC, jointly and severally, in the amount of $35,000.00, as provided in the Arbitration Award entered on April 19, 2016. All claims against Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC, are dismissed with prejudice, as provided in the Arbitration Award entered April 19, 2016. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 7/6/2016 (wld)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 38 Motion Confirm Arbiration Award Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 06/30/2016 (Guirola, Louis)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 22 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 03/04/2015 (Guirola, Louis)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 14 Motion for Reconsideration re 12 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings ; granting 14 Motion to Alter Judgment. The Court's Order 12 entered on Januar y 12, 2015 is set aside. The parties shall submit the claims against Tower to arbitration as provided by the Arbitration agreement and further proceedings against Tower are stayed pending arbitration. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 02/04/2015 (Guirola, Louis)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 3 Motion to Compel; denying 3 Motion to Stay Proceedings Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 01/29/2015 (Guirola, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Mark Gibson, HL & C Jackson, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Richards
Represented By: Jason E. Graeber
Represented By: Matthew Stephen Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gibson, HL & C Jackson, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Represented By: Jane B. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?