Smith v. Union National Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jeanetta Smith
Defendant: Union National Life Insurance Company, Kemper Corporation and John and Jane Does A; B; C; D; E; and F
Case Number: 1:2015cv00009
Filed: January 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 357 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 364 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 378 Motion to Strike; denying 378 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/22/18 (aa)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER granting 385 Motion to Substitute Exhibit; denying 389 Motion to Strike. Union National may substitute Exhibit E to its Motion for Summary Judgment [357-20] with Exhibit A to its Motion to Substitute Exhibit [385-1]. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/3/18 (aa)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER denying as moot 195 Motion to Strike ; granting 212 Motion for Leave Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/11/2017 (dtj)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion to Dismiss; granting 161 Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiff's claims against Separate Defendants are dismissed with prejudice; denying 169 Motion for Leave to File; denying 173 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/14/2017 (dtj)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER. Response to Motion to File Amended Complaint 169 due on or before January 30, 2017, rebuttal due on or before February 6, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/18/2017 (dtj)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER re 161 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has until on or before January 17, 2017 to respond to this Motion. If Movant wishes to file a rebuttal it may do so on or before January 24, 2017 Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/4/2017 (dtj)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 60 Motion for Reconsideration re 59 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marshall Funeral Home, Inc. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on April 11, 2016 (dsl)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying Third-Party Defendant Marshall Funeral Home, Inc.'s 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on April 6, 2016 (dsl)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting Plaintiff's 12 MOTION to Stay Defendant Kemper's 7 Motion for Summary Judgment. Kemper's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be stayed pending further discovery. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on October 26, 2015 (dsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Union National Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanetta Smith
Represented By: Christopher Collins Van Cleave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemper Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does A; B; C; D; E; and F
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?