Git-R-Done Productions, Inc. v. Giterdone C Store, LLC
Plaintiff: Git-R-Done Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Giterdone C Store, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00386
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying 115 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/28/2016 (Guirola, Louis)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying 124 Motion in Limine Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/20/2016 (Guirola, Louis)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 79 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 05/31/2016 (Guirola, Louis)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 32 Second MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Defendant's request to amend its Counterclaim is granted. Defendant is ordered to file a Second Amended Counterclaim complying with the directives discu ssed herein within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with the Court's directives may result in immediate dismissal of the Second Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 4/5/16 (PKS)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Granting Leave to File and Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 02/05/2016 (Guirola, Louis)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Git-R-Done Productions, Inc. v. Giterdone C Store, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Git-R-Done Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kaitlyn A. Dalton - PHV
Represented By: David M. Lilenfeld - PHV
Represented By: William E. Whitfield, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giterdone C Store, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Casano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?