Wiemer v. Rubino et al

Plaintiff: Robert Wiemer
Defendant: Denise Rubino and John Doe 1-5
Case Number: 1:2016cv00099
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Harrison
Referring Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2018 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING BRIEFING AND REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S ORDERS REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 2/12/18 (Whitsitt, K)
August 18, 2017 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 120 Motion to Dismiss; striking 122 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 124 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 126 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; striking 128 Motion to Dismiss; striking 130 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 132 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 8/18/17 (Whitsitt, K)
May 19, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Dismiss; denying 11 Motion to Remand to State Court Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 5/19/2016 (wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiemer v. Rubino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wiemer
Represented By: Roger Wayne Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Rubino
Represented By: Michael F. Held
Represented By: Donald P. Tremblay - PHV
Represented By: James G. Wyly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?