Jackson v. City of Gulfport et al
Plaintiff: Willie Louis Jackson
Defendant: City of Gulfport, Gulfport Police Department, Larry McCook, Adam Gibbions and Arron Fore
Case Number: 1:2016cv00420
Filed: November 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 35 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 1/5/2018 (wld)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 29 Report and Recommendations, granting 19 Motion to Dismiss, which this Court has construed as a Motion for Summary Judgment filed by City of Gulfport. Willie Louis Jackson's claims against the City of Gulfport are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 10/19/2017 (wld)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Memorandum Opinion and Order of Partial Dismissal Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 2/16/2017 (wld)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. City of Gulfport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Louis Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Gulfport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfport Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry McCook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Gibbions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arron Fore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?