Alidoust v. Hancock County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Safa Alidoust
Defendant: Hancock County, Mississippi, Hancock County Mississippi Sheriff's Department, Ricky Adam, Carl Contranchis, John Compton, Steve Saucier, Don Bass, Ronald Thompson, Brandon Zeringue, John Montgomery, Wayne E. Grayson, Health Assurance, LLC, City of Bay St. Louis Mississippi, Bay St. Louis Mississippi Police Department, Brad Epperson, Darren Freeman and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2017cv00035
Filed: February 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Hancock
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AGREED ORDER dismissing Defendant John Montgomery, M.D., with Prejudice. John Montgomery (Dr.) is hereby terminated as a defendant to this lawsuit. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 2/12/2018. (BR)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINAL ORDER: Ordered that plaintiff, Safa Alidousts claims against the City of Bay St. Louis and Brad Epperson are dismissed with prejudice for the reasons stated in this Courts prior 47 Memorandum Opinion and Order. City of Bay St. Louis Mississippi and Brad Epperson (Officer, Individually and as an Officer of Bay St. Louis Police Department) terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 11/13/17. (RLW)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Ordered that all state law claims against any Defendant and all official capacity claims against Defendant Brad Epperson are dismissed with prejudice; and that all claims against Defendants Sheriff Ricky Adam, Deputy Car l Contranchis, Deputy John Compton, Investigator Steve Saucier, Chief Deputy Don Bass, Jailer Ronald Thompson, Warden Brandon Zeringue, and Bay St. Louis Police Department are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is ordered to terminate these Defendan ts on the docket. Bay St. Louis Mississippi Police Department, John Compton (Deputy, Individually and as Deputy Sheriff of Hancock County Mississippi), Carl Contranchis (Deputy, Individually and as Deputy Sheriff of Hancock County Mississippi), Steve Saucier (Investigator, Individually and Investigator at Hancock County Mississippi Sheriff's Department), Ronald Thompson (Corrections Officer, Individually and as Corrections Officer at Hancock County Adult Detention Center), Brandon Zeringue (Warden, Individually and as Warden of Hancock County Adult Detention Center), Ricky Adam (Individually and as Sheriff of Hancock County Mississippi) and Don Bass (Chief Deputy, Individually and as Chief Deputy Sheriff of Hancock County Mississippi) terminated. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 8/24/17 (RLW)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 15 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 17 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 19 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Ordered that all state law claims against Defendants Adam, Contranchis, Compton, Saucier, Bass, Thompson, and Zeringue are dismissed with prejudice. The Title VI, ADA, and Rehabilitation Act claims against these Defendants in their individual capacities are also dismissed with prejudice. The remaining individual capacity claims are dismissed without prejudice; Ordered that Plaintiff Alidoust mus t file an Amended Complaint, as discussed herein, by 8/23/17; and Ordered that Plaintiff Alidoust must show cause by 8/23/17 why certain other claims in this action should not be dismissed, as discussed herein. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 8/2/17. (RLW)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss; and ordered that, should he choose to do so, Plaintiff must amend his Complaint as discussed herein within 14 days from the date of this Order, and sooner if feasible. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 6/22/17. (RLW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alidoust v. Hancock County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safa Alidoust
Represented By: Dianne Herman Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hancock County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hancock County Mississippi Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Adam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Contranchis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Saucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Zeringue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne E. Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Assurance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bay St. Louis Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay St. Louis Mississippi Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Epperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?