Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP v. 1.08 Acres in Section 3, Township 7 South, Range 9 West, Jackson County, Mississippi et al

Plaintiff: Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP
Defendant: Scott Gordon Richards, 7.93 Acres in Section 3, Township 7 South, Range 9 West, Jackson County, Mississippi, Unknown Heirs of Elmer J. Richards, Jr., Mary Ann Haas Richards, Johnna Fae Richards, Gary Keith Richards, Unknown Owners Having Interest in said Property, Louis Ray Richards, Jolie Yvette Richards, Elmer Joseph Richards, III, 1.08 Acres in Section 3, Township 7 South, Range 9 West, Jackson County, Mississippi, Gena Marie Girouard Owen, Elmer J. and Mary Ann Haas Richards Revocable Trust, Unknown Heirs of Irma Rita Richards, Unknown Heirs of Lynn Kelly Richards, Corey Richards and Jacob Kelly Richards
Case Number: 1:2018cv00254
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Jackson
0 Judge: John C Gargiulo
1 Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Bryant, Benjamin)
August 10, 2018 Filing 39 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP as to Jolie Yvette Richards served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Hightower, Karl)
August 10, 2018 Filing 38 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP as to Johnna Fae Richards served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Hightower, Karl)
August 10, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #26: Scanned document contains blank page(s). PDF documents should be checked for errors before filing. It is not necessary to re-file. (RLW)
August 9, 2018 Filing 37 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 36 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP as to Elmer J. and Mary Ann Haas Richards Revocable Trust served on 8/5/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Hightower, Karl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 35 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP as to Scott Gordon Richards served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Hightower, Karl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 34 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP as to Louis Ray Richards served on 8/5/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Hightower, Karl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP as to Jacob Kelly Richards served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Hightower, Karl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 32 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP as to Gena Marie Girouard Owen served on 8/4/2018, answer due 8/24/2018. (Hightower, Karl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP as to Gary Keith Richards served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Hightower, Karl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 30 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP as to Mary Ann Haas Richards served on 8/5/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Hightower, Karl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 28 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP as to Elmer Joseph Richards, III served on 8/5/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Hightower, Karl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE To: Unknown Owners by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Bryant, Benjamin)
August 9, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE To: Unknown Owners by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Bryant, Benjamin)
August 9, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE To: Unknown Heirs of Lynn Kelly Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Bryant, Benjamin)
August 9, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE To: Unknown Heirs of Irma Rita Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Bryant, Benjamin)
August 9, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE To: Unknown Heirs of Elmer J. Richards Jr. by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Bryant, Benjamin)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/6/2018 (AG)
August 3, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #21: Upon selecting the word Exhibit from the category box, the word Exhibit or Ex should not be included in the description box. (RLW)
August 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: When the Amended Complaint was filed, the individual defendant's name should have been selected, not all Defendants. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
August 2, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Service by Publication by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Affidavit of Benjamin Bryant, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Proposed Rule 71.1 Notices)(Bryant, Benjamin)
August 1, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE to Richards Revocable Trust-Mary Ann Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE to Richards Revocable Trust - Elmer Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE to Richards Estate-Scott Gordon Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE to Richards Estate-Louis Ray Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE to Richards Estate-Jolie Yvette Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE to Richards Estate-Johnna Fae Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE Richards Estate-Jacob Kelly Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE to Richards Estate-Gena Owen by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE to Richards Estate-Gary Keith Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE to Richards Estate-Elmer Joseph Richards III by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE to Richards Estate-Corey Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE to Mary Ann Haas Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 6 and # 7. Wrong event was used. Documents will be re-filed using the generic "Notice". Both of these documents will be disregarded on the docket. (JCH)
August 1, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE to Elmer Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 7 **DISREGARD**NOTICE by Publication-Richards Estate-Unknown Heirs of Irma Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl) Modified on 8/1/2018 (JCH).
August 1, 2018 Filing 6 **DISREGARD**NOTICE by Publication - Richards Estate-Unknown Heirs of Elmer Richards by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hightower, Karl) Modified on 8/1/2018 (JCH).
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP identifying Corporate Parent Boardwalk Pipeline Partners, LP for Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP. (Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Bryant on behalf of Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Bryant, Benjamin)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Elmer Richards Trust Plat, #2 Exhibit 2 - Elmer Richards Estate Plat, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Dan Fleming, #4 Exhibit 3A - Certification, #5 Exhibit 3B - Resolution)(Hightower, Karl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Hewes Hood on behalf of Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Hood, Katherine)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against 1.08 Acres in Section 3, Township 7 South, Range 9 West, Jackson County, Mississippi, 7.93 Acres in Section 3, Township 7 South, Range 9 West, Jackson County, Mississippi, Elmer J. and Mary Ann Haas Richards Revocable Trust, Gena Marie Girouard Owen, Elmer Joseph Richards, III, Elmer Joseph Richards, III(both individually and as Trustee for Elmer J. and Mary Ann Haas Richards Revocable Trust), Gary Keith Richards, Johnna Fae Richards, Jolie Yvette Richards, Louis Ray Richards, Mary Ann Haas Richards, Scott Gordon Richards, Unknown Heirs of Elmer J. Richards, Jr., Unknown Heirs of Irma Rita Richards, Unknown Heirs of Lynn Kelly Richards, Unknown Owners Having Interest in said Property (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-3771561), filed by Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Elmer Richards Trust Plat, #3 Exhibit 2 - Elmer Richards Estate Plat, #4 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Dan Fleming, #5 Exhibit 3 A - Certification, #6 Exhibit 3 B - Resolution) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP v. 1.08 Acres in Section 3, Township 7 South, Range 9 West, Jackson County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Gordon Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.93 Acres in Section 3, Township 7 South, Range 9 West, Jackson County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of Elmer J. Richards, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Haas Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnna Fae Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Keith Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners Having Interest in said Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Ray Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolie Yvette Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmer Joseph Richards, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.08 Acres in Section 3, Township 7 South, Range 9 West, Jackson County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gena Marie Girouard Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmer J. and Mary Ann Haas Richards Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of Irma Rita Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of Lynn Kelly Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Kelly Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP
Represented By: Karl C. Hightower
Represented By: Katherine Hewes Hood
Represented By: Benjamin Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?