Cody et al v. Shapiro & Massey, LLC

Plaintiff: Timothy S. Cody and Stacy M. Cody
Defendant: Shapiro & Massey, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00262
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Shapiro & Massey, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice)(Drinkwater, William)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Shapiro & Massey, LLC (Drinkwater, William)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William Dement Drinkwater on behalf of Shapiro & Massey, LLC (Drinkwater, William)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. McCullough, II on behalf of Shapiro & Massey, LLC (McCullough, James)
September 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Shapiro & Massey, LLC answer due 10/3/2018. (RLW)
September 17, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4: The service date is incorrect. According to the proof of service, the correct date is 9/12/2018. Attorney is not required to re-file. Court staff has made the correction. (RLW)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy S. Cody, Stacy M. Cody. Shapiro & Massey, LLC served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Ramsey, Michael)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint Exhibit A by Stacy M. Cody, Timothy S. Cody (Ramsey, Michael)
August 10, 2018 Remark: Summonses mailed to attorney via regular us mail. (RLW)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shapiro & Massey, LLC (RLW)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Shapiro & Massey, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-3779745), filed by Timothy S. Cody, Stacy M. Cody (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cody et al v. Shapiro & Massey, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy S. Cody
Represented By: Michael T. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy M. Cody
Represented By: Michael T. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro & Massey, LLC
Represented By: William Dement Drinkwater
Represented By: James A. McCullough, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?