Kerley v. Hatch et al

Plaintiff: Glen Kerley
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10, Larry Anderson, XYZ Companies 1-10 and Torrence Hatch
Case Number: 1:2018cv00273
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set during a three-week term of Court beginning on 9/3/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 8/21-22/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Discovery due by 3/13/2019. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2018. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2018. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 12/3/2018. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 1/11/2019. Motions due by 3/27/2019. Settlement Conference set for 5/15/2019 01:30 PM in Chambers 870 (Gulfport) Walker before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. ADR Report due by 8/14/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2019. EDT: 3 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/1/2018 (SR)
October 1, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/1/2018 with attorneys David Bruce Krause and Eduardo Alberto Flechas. (SR)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Glen Kerley (Krause, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Core/Initial Disclosure by Larry Anderson, Torrence Hatch (Flechas, Eduardo)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim by Glen Kerley.(Krause, David)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Glen Kerley by Larry Anderson, Torrence Hatch (Flechas, Eduardo)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2018 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
August 23, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 2. Attorney is advised that this document should have been filed as a "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)", which can be found under the "Other Documents" category. Attorney does not need to re-file. (JCH)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Glen Kerley by Larry Anderson, Torrence Hatch.(Flechas, Eduardo)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Larry Anderson, Torrence Hatch from Harrison County Circuit Court - Second Judicial District, case number A2402-2018-35. (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 14643010583) Jury trial requested in lower court. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Lower court complaint)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerley v. Hatch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Kerley
Represented By: David Bruce Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Anderson
Represented By: Eduardo Alberto Flechas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrence Hatch
Represented By: Eduardo Alberto Flechas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?