State Farm and Casualty Company v. Ruby Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: State Farm and Casualty Company
Defendant: Jadot Construction, LLC and Ruby Construction, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00318
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
2 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Remark: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal #6 attorney is to include the case number and new judge assignment of 1:18cv318LG-MTP on future filed pleadings. (PKS)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/19/18 (PKS)
October 10, 2018 Remark: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal #5 attorney is to include the case number and new judge assignment of 1:18cv318LG-JCG on future filed pleadings. (PKS)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/10/18 (PKS)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT to properly plead subject matter jurisdiction against All Defendants, filed by State Farm and Casualty Company.(Brouillette, James)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to supplement #1 Complaint to properly plead subject matter jurisdiction by 10/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 5, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
October 4, 2018 Remark: Original summonses mailed to plaintiff's attorney (PKS)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jadot Construction, LLC, Ruby Construction, LLC. (PKS)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jadot Construction, LLC, Ruby Construction, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-3825645) filed by State Farm and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm and Casualty Company v. Ruby Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jadot Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm and Casualty Company
Represented By: James E. Brouillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?