Harris v. Navigator Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Barbara Harris
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC and Navigator Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2018cv00339
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 #9 Unopposed Motions for Extension of Time. The deadline for Trans Union, LLC and Navigator Credit Union to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 is now 12/28/18. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/11/18 (HM)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Navigator Credit Union (Peeples, Timothy)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC (Driskell, Mitchell)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC (Driskell, Mitchell)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Harris. (Bellinder, Thomas)
December 4, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5: Proof of Service of a summons should be completed and filed with the first page, as issued. Attorney is directed to refile AO form 440 that was issued by the Court and complete the proof of service of summons. The proof of service by process server may be filed as an exhibit with a description to the Summons Returned Executed. This document will be disregarded on the docket. (PKS)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 *** DISREGARD *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Harris. Navigator Credit Union served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Bellinder, Thomas) Modified on 12/4/2018 (PKS).
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Harris. Trans Union, LLC served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Bellinder, Thomas)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Harris. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Bellinder, Thomas)
October 24, 2018 Summons mailed to Thomas J. Bellinder at Jackson address on docket. (wld)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Navigator Credit Union, Trans Union, LLC. (wld)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Navigator Credit Union, Trans Union, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3840004), filed by Barbara Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Settlement Letter, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Payment, #3 Exhibit C-Credit Report, #4 Exhibit D-Letter and Certified Mail Receipts, #5 Exhibit E-Credit Reports, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Navigator Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell O. Driskell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigator Credit Union
Represented By: Timothy M. Peeples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Harris
Represented By: Thomas J. Bellinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?