Crosby et al v. Pippin et al

Plaintiff: Benjamin F. Crosby, III, Benjamin F. Crosby, Jr. and Paula Crosby
Defendant: Re/Max Holdings, Inc., Julia E. Pippin and Pippin Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00343
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Response to Order re #2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, requiring Plaintiffs to file a response or amended complaint establishing diversity jurisdiction on or before 11/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/2/18 (HM) filed by Benjamin F. Crosby, III, Benjamin F. Crosby, Jr, Paula Crosby (Musgrove, David)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Julia E. Pippin, Pippin Enterprises, Inc., Re/Max Holdings, Inc. (RLW)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, requiring Plaintiffs to file a response or amended complaint establishing diversity jurisdiction on or before 11/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/2/18 (HM)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Julia E. Pippin, Pippin Enterprises, Inc., Re/Max Holdings, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-3840946), filed by Benjamin F. Crosby, III, Benjamin F. Crosby, Jr, Paula Crosby. Jury trial requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosby et al v. Pippin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin F. Crosby, III
Represented By: David Ronald Musgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin F. Crosby, Jr.
Represented By: David Ronald Musgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Crosby
Represented By: David Ronald Musgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re/Max Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia E. Pippin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pippin Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?