Wilborn v. Equifax, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Martha Wilborn
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Equifax, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00371
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 State Court Record by Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Equifax, Inc. (Pickett, Kaytie)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC, Equifax, Inc. (Pickett, Kaytie)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC, Equifax, Inc. (Pickett, Kaytie)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pickett, Kaytie)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax, Inc. (Pickett, Kaytie)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equifax Information Services, LLC, Equifax, Inc. from Circuit Court of George County, Mississippi, case number 18-196(1), with jury demand in lower court. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-3860121) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilborn v. Equifax, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Kaytie M. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Kaytie M. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Wilborn
Represented By: B. W. Curry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?