Wallace v. K & B Mississippi Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Robin A. Wallace
Defendant: K & B Mississippi Corporation and John and Jane Does A; B; C; and D
Case Number: 1:2019cv00012
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
February 26, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4, #5 and #6: Advising attorney that the plaintiff's name should be listed in all future filed pleadings as it was filed in the Complaint, Robin A. Wallace. (RLW)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by K & B Mississippi Corporation (Crawley, Timothy)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by K & B Mississippi Corporation.(Crawley, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. K & B Mississippi Corporation answer due 2/28/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on February 8, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by K & B Mississippi Corporation (Crawley, Timothy)
January 24, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: Scanned document contains blank page(s). PDF documents should be checked for errors before filing. It is not necessary to refile. (RLW)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin A. Wallace. K & B Mississippi Corporation served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Gunn, Corban)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to K & B Mississippi Corporation. (RLW)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against John and Jane Does A; B; C; and D, K & B Mississippi Corporation (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 14643010970), filed by Robin A. Wallace (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. K & B Mississippi Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin A. Wallace
Represented By: Corban Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K & B Mississippi Corporation
Represented By: Timothy D. Crawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does A; B; C; and D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?