Fairley v. Omega Protein, Inc.

Plaintiff: John L Fairley
Defendant: Omega Protein, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00013
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Louis Guirola
1 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on March 7, 2019 (King, Steve)
March 4, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #20: Advising attorney that the Motion attached as the main pdf document should not have been filed. The Application attached as an exhibit should have been filed as the Motion. In the future, attorney will be required to re-file. (RLW)
March 1, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for D'Ann R. Penner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John L Fairley (Attachments: #1 Attachment Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hopkins, Alben)
March 1, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for D'Ann R. Penner receipt number 0538-3930061 $ 100 (Hopkins, Alben)
February 13, 2019 Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference RESET for 4/24/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Counsel will follow the instructions given in the Initial Rule 16(a) Order. (SR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 19 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Alan K Breaud terminated. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on February 4, 2019 (King, Steve)
February 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Omega Protein, Inc. (Feeney, Fredrick)
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Omega Protein, Inc..(Feeney, Fredrick)
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Fredrick B. Feeney, II on behalf of Omega Protein, Inc. (Feeney, Fredrick)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Traci M. Castille on behalf of Omega Protein, Inc. (Castille, Traci)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 Letter sent to Alan K. Breaud and Lawrence N. Curtis, on 1/14/2019 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (JCH)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 6:18-cv-01037. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM RULING and ORDER granting re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Mississippi filed by Omega Protein Inc and the instant matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/11/2019. (crt,Bunting, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Mississippi. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 11/21/2018 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Mississippi. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 11/20/2018 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Mississippi by Omega Protein Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, the Declaration of C. David Ott, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Breaud, Alan) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to case. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/26/2018. (crt,Benoit, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Omega Protein Inc is granted a thirty (30) day extension of time for the filing of responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/10/2018. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Omega Protein Inc identifying Corporate Parent Omega Protein Corp for Omega Protein Inc. (aty,Breaud, Alan) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Alan K Breaud on behalf of Omega Protein Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/20/2018. (crt,Bunting, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained by Omega Protein Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Attempts to Obtain Consent, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Alan K Breaud added to party Omega Protein Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Breaud, Alan) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John L Fairley. Omega Protein Inc served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (aty,Curtis, Lawrence) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Omega Protein Inc (crt,Bunting, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
August 10, 2018 Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst added. (crt,Bunting, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Omega Protein, Inc. (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by John L. Fairley. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Lawrence N Curtis added to party John L. Fairley(pty:pla))(aty,Curtis, Lawrence) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 1/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairley v. Omega Protein, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L Fairley
Represented By: Lawrence N Curtis
Represented By: D'Ann R. Penner - PHV
Represented By: Alben N. Hopkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Protein, Inc.
Represented By: Alan K Breaud
Represented By: Traci M. Castille
Represented By: Alan K *Breaud-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Fredrick B. Feeney, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?