McCarthy v. DSLD Mortgage, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Emma R. McCarthy
Defendant: DSLD Mortgage, LLC and DSLD Homes (Gulf Coast), LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00047
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered that Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 3/19/19. (JCH)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Emma R. McCarthy (wld)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DSLD Homes (Gulf Coast), LLC, DSLD Mortgage, LLC (Davis, Christopher)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by DSLD Homes (Gulf Coast), LLC, DSLD Mortgage, LLC (Davis, Christopher)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davis on behalf of DSLD Homes (Gulf Coast), LLC, DSLD Mortgage, LLC (Davis, Christopher)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emma R. McCarthy. DSLD Mortgage, LLC c/o CT Corporation System served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (wld)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emma R. McCarthy. DSLD Homes (Gulf Coast), LLC c/o CT Corporation System served on 2/14/2019. (wld)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emma R. McCarthy. DSLD Homes (Gulf Coast), LLC served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (wld)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emma R. McCarthy. DSLD Mortgage, LLC served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (wld)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DSLD Homes (Gulf Coast), LLC, DSLD Mortgage, LLC. (wld)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against DSLD Homes (Gulf Coast), LLC, DSLD Mortgage, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14643011057), filed by Emma R. McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Secretary of State Certificates, #2 Power of Attorney, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Assignment)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarthy v. DSLD Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma R. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSLD Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSLD Homes (Gulf Coast), LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?