Atwell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Donald Russell Atwell, Sr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00157
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Briefing Deadline by Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Nobile-Federal Gov, Emily)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Memorandum Brief. Plaintiff's memorandum brief is due by 7/17/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 18, 2019 (King, Steve)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum Brief by Donald Russell Atwell, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(wld)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Donald Russell Atwell, Sr. Service made upon: Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wld)(Return was re-filed to include first page of summons form)
June 3, 2019 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #11. A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. (wld)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Donald Russell Atwell, Sr. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 5/30/2019. Service made upon: Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(wld)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (JCH)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Nobile-Federal Gov, Emily)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Nobile-Federal Gov, Emily)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Donald Russell Atwell, Sr.(wld)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on March 20, 2019 (King, Steve)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Donald Russell Atwell, Sr. Service made upon: Commissioner of SSA. (wld)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Donald Russell Atwell, Sr. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 3/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney. (wld)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney. (wld)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14643011156), filed by Donald Russell Atwell, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Appeals Council Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atwell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Russell Atwell, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Emily S. Nobile-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?