IN RE: National Truck Funding, LLC

Appellant: Yolo Capital, Inc., National Truck Funding, LLC, American Truck Group, LLC, First United Management, Inc., Hannah Baby, LLC and Moonpie, FLP
Appellee: Chaffe & Associates, Inc. and Chaffe Securities, Inc.
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Gulfport
Case Number: 1:2019cv00160
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellee/Cross-Appellant's brief. The brief is due on July 31, 2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 6/24/2019. (BR)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellee/Cross-Appellant Brief by Chaffe Securities, Inc. (McCullough, James)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 Appellant's BRIEF by American Truck Group, LLC, First United Management, Inc., Hannah Baby, LLC, Moonpie, FLP, National Truck Funding, LLC, Yolo Capital, Inc.. (Draper - PHV, Douglas)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 - Clerk's Certificate, #2 - Docket Sheet, #3 - Appellant Designated Items, #4 - Appellant Designated Items, #5 - Appellant Designated Items, #6 - Appellee Designated Items, #7 - Appellee Designated Items, #8 - Appellee Designated Items, #9 - Cross Appellee Designated Items, #10 - Cross Appellee Designated Items, #11 - Other Documents)(JCH)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Hannah Baby, LLC, et al. v. Chaffe Securities, Inc., et al., Case 1:19cv173-LG-RHW is hereby consolidated into this case and all future filings shall be filed in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on April 17, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Douglas S. Draper and Greta M. Brouphy shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the appellants and/or debtors American Truck Group, LLC, First United Management, Inc., Hannah Baby, LLC, Moonpie, FLP, National Truck Funding, LLC, and Yolo Capital, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on April 16, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Greta M. Brouphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3967318) by American Truck Group, LLC, American Truck Group, LLC, First United Management, Inc., Hannah Baby, LLC, Moonpie, FLP, National Truck Funding, LLC, National Truck Funding, LLC, Yolo Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wheeler, David) Modified on 4/16/2019 (wld).
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by American Truck Group, LLC, American Truck Group, LLC, First United Management, Inc., Hannah Baby, LLC, Moonpie, FLP, National Truck Funding, LLC, National Truck Funding, LLC (Wheeler, David)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by American Truck Group, LLC, American Truck Group, LLC, First United Management, Inc., Hannah Baby, LLC, Moonpie, FLP, National Truck Funding, LLC, National Truck Funding, LLC, Yolo Capital, Inc. (Wheeler, David) Modified on 4/16/2019 (wld).
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Douglas S. Draper to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3967155) by American Truck Group, LLC, American Truck Group, LLC, First United Management, Inc., Hannah Baby, LLC, Moonpie, FLP, National Truck Funding, LLC, National Truck Funding, LLC, Yolo Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wheeler, David) Modified on 4/16/2019 (wld).
April 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by D. Skylar Rosenbloom $ 100, receipt number 34643054435 (wld)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. D. Skylar Rosenbloom shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the Appellees Chaffe & Associates, Inc. and Chaffe Securities, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on April 11, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for D. Skylar Rosenbloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chaffe & Associates, Inc., Chaffe Securities, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McCullough, James)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Letter sent to Douglas Scott Draper, Loretta G. Mince and D. Skylar Rosenbloom on 3/22/2019 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (wld)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-51243-KMS. File received The docketing of the record on appeal by USDC starts the briefing schedule. Attorneys should refer to Bankruptcy Rule 8018 for all briefing schedules., filed by American Truck Group, LLC, Yolo Capital, Inc., First United Management, Inc., Hannah Baby, LLC, Moonpie, FLP, National Truck Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Cover Letter)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: National Truck Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Yolo Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper - PHV-Transfer BK
Represented By: David A. Wheeler
Represented By: Greta M. Brouphy - PHV
Represented By: Douglas S. Draper - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: National Truck Funding, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper - PHV-Transfer BK
Represented By: David A. Wheeler
Represented By: Greta M. Brouphy - PHV
Represented By: Douglas S. Draper - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: American Truck Group, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper - PHV-Transfer BK
Represented By: David A. Wheeler
Represented By: Greta M. Brouphy - PHV
Represented By: Douglas S. Draper - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: First United Management, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper - PHV-Transfer BK
Represented By: David A. Wheeler
Represented By: Greta M. Brouphy - PHV
Represented By: Douglas S. Draper - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Hannah Baby, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper - PHV-Transfer BK
Represented By: David A. Wheeler
Represented By: Greta M. Brouphy - PHV
Represented By: Douglas S. Draper - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Moonpie, FLP
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper - PHV-Transfer BK
Represented By: David A. Wheeler
Represented By: Greta M. Brouphy - PHV
Represented By: Douglas S. Draper - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chaffe & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Loretta G. Mince - PHV
Represented By: James A. McCullough, II
Represented By: D. Skylar Rosenbloom - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chaffe Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Loretta G. Mince - PHV
Represented By: James A. McCullough, II
Represented By: D. Skylar Rosenbloom - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Christopher James Steiskal-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Gulfport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?