Islam v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: Nasir Islam
Defendant: 3M Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00262
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Confirmation of case electronically transferred from the Southern District of MS to the Northern District of Florida filed 5/17/19 and assigned case number 3/19cv1505. (RLW)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Northern District of Florida and assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (RLW)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Letter sent to MDL Clerk with docket entries and complaint/notice of removal. (RLW) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/6/2019) (RLW).
May 3, 2019 Remark: Original Summons mailed to attorney to address on docket via regular us mail (RLW)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (RLW)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against 3M Company (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 05383981761), filed by Nasir Islam (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Islam v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nasir Islam
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?