James v. Social Security Admin
Plaintiff: Shelton Barnell James
Defendant: Social Security Admin
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00265
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting Report and Recommendations re #3 Report and Recommendations. Ordered that the filing fee is due within 60 days of the entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 6/25/19. (JCH)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Objections to R&R due by 6/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 3, 2019. (js)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shelton Barnell James (RLW)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Admin, filed by Shelton Barnell James (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2019: #2 Notice of Assignment) (RLW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Social Security Admin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Admin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelton Barnell James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?